EP3669843 - SUPERABSORBENT WOUND DRESSING WITH SILICONE WOUND CONTACT LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hartmann AG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2023/43] |
Former [2021/27] | For all designated states Paul Hartmann AG Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states Paul Hartmann S.A. 9 route de Selestat 67730 Châtenois / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCKEL, Fabien 14 rue de Belfort 67100 Straßbourg / FR | 02 /
THIEBAUT, Renaud 2 rue du Languedoc 67730 Chatenois / FR | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Paul Hartmann AG Patents & Licensing Paul-Hartmann-Straße 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2020/26] | Matzdorf, Thorsten, et al Paul Hartmann AG Patents & Licensing Paul-Hartmann-Straße 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 18215471.6 | 21.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3669843 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3669843 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
A61F13/022 (EP,US);
A61F13/0209 (US);
A61F13/0206 (EP);
A61F13/0223 (EP,US);
A61F13/025 (EP,US);
A61F13/0253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUPERABSORBIERENDER WUNDVERBAND MIT SILIKONWUNDKONTAKTSCHICHT | [2020/26] | English: | SUPERABSORBENT WOUND DRESSING WITH SILICONE WOUND CONTACT LAYER | [2020/26] | French: | PANSEMENT AVEC UNE COUCHE DE CONTACT DE SILICONE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 07.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.2024
24.07.2024
ADMISSIBLE Lohmann & Rauscher GmbH & Co. KG Irlicher Strasse 55 56567 Neuwied / DE Opponent's representative Herrmann, Daniel Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/35] | 08.08.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | MC | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | LU | 21.12.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
IT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SK | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP2001424 (BRIGHTWAKE LTD [GB]); | [Y]DE102008062824 (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]); | [IY]WO2010147533 (MOELNLYCKE HEALTH CARE AB [SE], et al); | [IY]GB2512841 (BRIGHTWAKE LTD [GB]); | [IY]GB2531344 (BRIGHTWAKE LTD [GB]); | [Y]US9452086 (AUGUSTE STEPHANE [FR], et al); | [IY]WO2017196888 (CONVATEC TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [I]WO2018077872 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]); | by applicant | GB1280631 | WO9319709 | WO9319710 | WO2014097069 | Opposition | GB2379392 | US6566577 | US6903243 | EP1985270 | US2010331785 | US8247635 | US2013012902 | WO2014020440 | EP2039328 | WO2014167307 | US2014350494 | WO2016038109 | US2017181897 | US2018125722 | EP3338813 |