EP3505156 - MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF CYCLOSPORIN EYE GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhaoke (Guangzhou) Ophthalmology Pharmaceutical Ltd. Room 501 5th Floor, No. 1, Meide 3rd Road Pearl River Industrial Park Nansha District Guangzhou, Guangdong Province / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Zhaoke (Guangzhou) Ophthalmology Pharmaceutical Ltd. Room 501, 5th Floor, No. 1 Meide 3rd Road Pearl River Industrial Park Nansha District Guangzhou, Guangdong Province / CN | ||
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Zhaoke (Guangzhou) Opthalmic Drug 1 Meide 3rd Road, Pearl River, Industrial Park Nansha District Guangzhou City Guangdong 230088 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Gang No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | 02 /
Cao, Kailei No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | 03 /
Li, Xiaoyi 1/F, Buildin g 20E, Phase 3, Hong Kong Science Park Shatin / HK | 04 /
Dai, Xiangrong No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | 05 /
Yin, Lei No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | 06 /
Ling, Juan No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | 07 /
Li, Xiaoyi 1/F, Building 20E, Phase 3, Hong Kong Science Park Shatin / HK | [2020/29] |
Former [2019/27] | 01 /
Li, Gang No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | ||
02 /
Cao, Kailei No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | |||
03 /
Li, Xiaoyi 1/F, Buildin g 20E, Phase 3, Hong Kong Science Park Shatin / HK | |||
04 /
Dai, Xiangrong No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | |||
05 /
Yin, Lei No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | |||
06 /
Ling, Juan No. 30, Tianzhi Road, New and High - Tech Industrial Development Zone Hefei City, Anhui 230088 / CN | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 18215549.9 | 21.12.2018 | [2019/27] | Priority number, date | CN201711427891 | 26.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711427891 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505156 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3505156 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107, A61K38/13, A61K47/10, A61K47/32, A61K47/44 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/44 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/06 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN VON CYCLOSPORIN-AUGENGEL | [2019/27] | English: | MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF CYCLOSPORIN EYE GEL | [2019/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE GEL OCULAIRE DE CYCLOSPORINE | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/27] | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2018 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | TR | 25.11.2020 | LU | 21.12.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.12.2018 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MT | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
TR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | PT | 25.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1686533 (SHANGHAI INST MATERIA MEDICA [CN]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101897949 (WINSTON MEDICAL SUPPLY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]CN103735495 (ZHAOKE PHARMACEUTICAL HEFEI CO LTD) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - YINGQING RAN ET AL, "Solubilization of cyclosporin A", AAPS PHARMSCITECH, (200103), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1208/pt020102, pages 23 - 26, XP055582661 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1208/pt020102 | by applicant | CN20141033737 |