EP3546393 - LOCKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LOCKING A WHEEL TRACK TO AN END BEAM, CARTON FLOW BED RACK AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interroll Holding AG Via Gorelle 3 6592 Sant' Antonino / CH | [2023/26] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Interroll Holding AG Zona Industriale Via Gorelle 3 6592 Sant' Antonino / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laplace, Jean Michel 41 rue Arthur Rimbaud 85000 La Roche sur Yon / FR | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Kohlhof, Stephan Interroll Innovation GmbH Opelstr. 1 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [2023/27] |
Former [2019/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18290024.1 | 28.03.2018 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546393 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546393 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/02, B65G13/11 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
B65G1/023 (EP,US);
B65G13/11 (EP,US);
B65G35/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERRIEGELN EINER RADBAHN AN EINEM ENDBALKEN, KARTONFLIESSBETTGESTELL UND VERWENDUNG | [2019/40] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR LOCKING A WHEEL TRACK TO AN END BEAM, CARTON FLOW BED RACK AND USE | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DESTINÉ À VERROUILLER UN EMPATTEMENT DE ROUE À UN FAISCEAU D'EXTRÉMITÉ, CASIER DE DISTRIBUTION DE CARTON ET UTILISATION | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 01.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2431304 (COURTIN ERIC [FR]) [X] 1-6,10-13,15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0068]; figure -; claim - * [I] 7-9,14; | [Y]JP2012116635 (OGUCHI KATSUMASA) [Y] 1,10,11,15* paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005]; figure - *; | [XI]US2017305670 (TONG FEI [CN]) [X] 1-6,10-13,15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0049]; figure -; claim - * [I] 7-9,14; | [Y]DE102016009162 (FM SYSTEME FÖRDER- UND MONTAGETECHNIK SCHMALZHOFER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,10,11,15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0038]; figure -; claim - * |