EP3543959 - DYNAMIC DISPLAY OF OBJECTS WITHIN A VIRTUAL WORLD BY OCTREE-BASED PARTITIONING AND PUBLISH/SUBSCRIBE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novaquark 130 rue de Lourmel 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILLIE, Jean-Christophe 5 rue des Feuillantines 75005 Paris / FR | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 18305318.0 | 22.03.2018 | [2019/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3543959 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
G06T17/005 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (US);
G06T19/00 (CN);
H04L67/131 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
G06T2200/16 (US);
G06T2210/08 (US);
G06T2210/61 (US);
H04L67/55 (US);
H04W84/042 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE ANZEIGE VON OBJEKTEN INNERHALB EINER VIRTUELLEN WELT DURCH OCTREE-BASIERTE PARTITIONIERUNG UND VERÖFFENTLICHEN-/ABONNIEREN-KOMMUNIKATION | [2019/39] | English: | DYNAMIC DISPLAY OF OBJECTS WITHIN A VIRTUAL WORLD BY OCTREE-BASED PARTITIONING AND PUBLISH/SUBSCRIBE COMMUNICATION | [2019/39] | French: | AFFICHAGE DYNAMIQUE D'OBJETS DANS UN MONDE VIRTUEL PAR PARTITIONNEMENT À BASE D'OCTREE ET COMMUNICATION DE PUBLICATION/ABONNEMENT | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 16.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/26] | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6767287 (MCQUAID BRAD D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,8 * * column 4, line 10 - line 44 * * column 9, line 24 - line 46 * * column 22, line 36 - column 24, line 4 *; | [A]US2010146128 (KULKARNI SANTOSH [AU], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0054] , [0056] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0081] ** paragraphs [0096] , [0102] , [0103] *; | [A] - CHRIS GAUTHIERDICKEY ET AL, "Using n-trees for scalable event ordering in peer-to-peer games", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH. INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON NETWORK AND OPERATING SYSTEMS SUPPORT FOR DIGITAL AUDIO AND VIDEO. NOSSDAV 2005. STEVENSON, WA, JUNE 13 - 14, 2005; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON NETWORK AND OPERATING SYSTEM SUPPORT, (20050613), doi:10.1145/1065983.1066005, ISBN 978-1-58113-987-7, pages 87 - 92, XP058264179 [A] 1-13 * section 1 "introduction"; page 87, column l - page 88, column l * * section 3 "definitions"; page 88, column r - page 89, column r * * section 5.3 "event propagation"; page 90, column r * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1065983.1066005 | [A] - JIACHEN CHEN ET AL, "G-COPSS: A content centric communication infrastructure for gaming applications", LOCAL&METROPOLITAN AREA NETWORKS (LANMAN), 2011 18TH IEEE WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, (20111013), doi:10.1109/LANMAN.2011.6076923, ISBN 978-1-4577-1264-7, pages 1 - 6, XP032021196 [A] 1-13 * section I "Introduction"; page 1, column l - page 2, column l * * section II "Related Work"; page 2, column r, paragraph 4 * * section III "G-COPSS: An efficient communication infrastrcuture for MMORPG"; page 3, column l, paragraph 1 * * paragraphs III.A and III.B; page 3, column r - page 4, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LANMAN.2011.6076923 | [A] - JOHN C S LUI ET AL, "AN EFFICIENT PARTITIONING ALGORITHM FOR DISTRIBUTED VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENT SYSTEMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20020301), vol. 13, no. 3, doi:10.1109/71.993202, ISSN 1045-9219, page 193, XP011094306 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * Section 1 "Introduction", item "Balancing Workload and Reducing Communication Cost"; page 194, column l - column r * * section 2.1 "DVE Architectures"; page 195, column r, paragraph 3 * * section 2.2 "Representation of Client as Avatar and its Area-Of-Interest (AOI)"; page 195, column r - page 196, column l * * section 3.3 "partitioning Algorithm"; page 198, column r - page 199, column l * * figures 1,2,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/71.993202 | [A] - CHRIS CARTER ET AL, "A Survey of AoIM, Distribution and Communication in Peer-To-Peer Online Games", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS (ICCCN), 2012 21ST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120730), doi:10.1109/ICCCN.2012.6289259, ISBN 978-1-4673-1543-2, pages 1 - 5, XP032229703 [A] 1-13 * section I "Introduction"; page 1 * * section III "advances in AOIM within P2P"; page 2, paragraph 1 * * section III.D "Geographic Ao; page 3, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCCN.2012.6289259 | [A] - SWARUN KUMAR ET AL, "CarSpeak", APPLICATIONS, TECHNOLOGIES, ARCHITECTURES, AND PROTOCOLS FOR COMPUTER COMMUNICATION, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20120813), doi:10.1145/2342356.2342403, ISBN 978-1-4503-1419-0, pages 259 - 270, XP058008022 [A] 1-13 * section 1 "introduction"; page 259, column r, paragraph 2 - page 260, column l * * section 3 "primer on autonomous vehicles"; page 261 * * section 4 "CARSPEAK's architecture"; page 261, column r, paragraph 4 - page 262, column l * * section 5.1 "information naming and representation"; page 262, column l - column r * * figures 1-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2342356.2342403 | [A] - YU MINGHE ET AL, "Efficient Filtering Algorithms for Location-Aware Publish/Subscribe", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON KNOWLEDGE AND DATA ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, vol. 27, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TKDE.2014.2349906, ISSN 1041-4347, (20150401), pages 950 - 963, (20150305), XP011574777 [A] 1-13 * section 1 "introduction"; paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0005] * * section 2.2 "related work"; page 951, column r, paragraphs 1,2,5 - page 952, column l * * section 3.2 "filtering algorithms"; page 953, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TKDE.2014.2349906 | [A] - LUCIANA ARANTES ET AL, "Enhanced DR-Tree for Low Latency Filtering in Publish/Subscribe Systems", ADVANCED INFORMATION NETWORKING AND APPLICATIONS (AINA), 2010 24TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100420), ISBN 978-1-4244-6695-5, pages 58 - 65, XP031682477 [A] 1-13 * section I "introduction"; page 58, column l, paragraph 1 * * section II "related work"; page 58, column r, paragraphs 1, 3, 4, 5 - page 59, column l * * section III "publish/subscribe model"; page 59, column l, paragraphs 1,2 - column r * * section IV "R-trees overlays"; page 59, column r - page 60, column l * * figure 1 * |