EP3594899 - TRACKING AN OBJECT IN A SEQUENCE OF PANORAMIC IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRIVELLI, Tomas Enrique c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 02 /
SIROT, Joël c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | 03 /
STAUDER, Jürgen c/o Technicolor 975 Avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 18305915.3 | 10.07.2018 | [2020/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594899 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
G06T7/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/215 (US);
H04N13/239 (US);
H04N13/395 (US);
H04N19/513 (US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG EINES OBJEKTS IN EINER FOLGE VON PANORAMABILDERN | [2020/03] | English: | TRACKING AN OBJECT IN A SEQUENCE OF PANORAMIC IMAGES | [2020/03] | French: | SUIVI D'UN OBJET DANS UNE SÉQUENCE D'IMAGES PANORAMIQUES | [2020/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016364912 (CHO HYUN WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0030] *; | [I]US2017127008 (KANKAANPÄÄ ESA [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 3a, 3b *; | [A] - Filiberto Pla ET AL, "Spherical Panoramas for Pan-Tilt Camera Motion Compensation in Space-Variant Images", Topics in Artificial Intelligence, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20021024), vol. 2504, pages 375 - 387, doi:10.1007/3-540-36079-4_33, ISBN 978-3-54-000011-2, XP055015465 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 376 - page 382 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-36079-4_33 | [A] - NOYER J-C ET AL, "Model-based tracking of 3D objects based on a sequential Monte-Carlo method", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, 2004. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY- EIGHTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA NOV. 7-10, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041107), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ACSSC.2004.1399459, ISBN 978-0-7803-8622-8, pages 1744 - 1748, XP010781206 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1745 - page 1746 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2004.1399459 | by applicant | - RAMEAU et al., "Visual tracking with omnidirectional cameras: an efficient approach", Electronics Letters, (20110000), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1049/el.2011.2838, pages 1183 - 1184, XP006040351 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el.2011.2838 |