EP3604978 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR REFUELLING CONTAINERS WITH PRESSURIZED GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCK, Marcus Georg-August-Str. 14 65195 WIESBADEN / DE | 02 /
WERLEN, Etienne C/O AIR LIQUIDE S. A. 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 PARIS / FR | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | De Cuenca, Emmanuel Jaime L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18306046.6 | 01.08.2018 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604978 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F25B45/00 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
F25B45/00 (EP);
F25B2600/0253 (EP);
F25B2600/2501 (EP);
F25B2600/2513 (EP);
F25B2700/1933 (EP);
F25B2700/197 (EP);
F25B2700/21151 (EP);
F25B2700/21172 (EP);
F25B2700/21174 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] |
Former [2020/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFÜLLUNG VON BEHÄLTERN MIT DRUCKGAS | [2020/06] | English: | DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR REFUELLING CONTAINERS WITH PRESSURIZED GAS | [2020/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RAVITAILLER DES RÉCIPIENTS AVEC DU GAZ SOUS PRESSION | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 05.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009091400 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al); | [Y]EP2738482 (DANFOSS AS [DK]); | [YD]WO2018104983 (AIR LIQUIDE JAPAN LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2015092108 | US2016348840 | WO2018104983 |