EP3629214 - METHOD FOR BUILDING A PREDEFINED SECRET VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Dis France SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOKLE, Milas C/O GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS cedex / FR | 02 /
HUYSMANS, Guillaume C/O GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS Cedex / FR | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Grevin, Emmanuel Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | Grevin, Emmanuel Thales Dis France SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18306271.0 | 27.09.2018 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3629214 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/78, G06F21/62 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
G06F21/78 (EP,US);
G06F21/6209 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINES VORDEFINIERTEN GEHEIMEN WERTES | [2020/14] | English: | METHOD FOR BUILDING A PREDEFINED SECRET VALUE | [2020/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION D'UNE VALEUR SECRÈTE PRÉDÉFINIE | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0235329 (ERUCES LLC [US], et al); | [A]US2003194085 (DILLAWAY BLAIR B [US]); | [A]US2018034791 (EREZ DANIEL [IL], et al) |