EP3667934 - PROTOCOL DETECTION FOR NEAR FIELD COMMUNICATION DEVICES OPERATING IN CARD-EMULATION MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus Building 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARPENTIER, Steve NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group Espace Park - Bât. C 45 allée des Ormes 06250 Mougins / FR | 02 /
MUEHLMANN, Ulrich Andreas NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MENDEL, Stefan NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18306656.2 | 10.12.2018 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667934 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3667934 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, G06K7/10 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G06K7/10297 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04B5/20 (EP);
H04B5/24 (EP);
H04B5/72 (US);
H04L69/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DETEKTION PROTOKOLLE FÜR NAHFELDKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN, DIE IM KARTENEMULATIONSMODUS BETRIEBEN WERDEN | [2020/25] | English: | PROTOCOL DETECTION FOR NEAR FIELD COMMUNICATION DEVICES OPERATING IN CARD-EMULATION MODE | [2020/25] | French: | DÉTECTION DE PROTOCOLE POUR DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION EN CHAMP PROCHE FONCTIONNANT EN MODE D'ÉMULATION DE CARTE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2061172 (FELICA NETWORKS INC [JP]); | [A]US2015256966 (MORI SHUZO [JP]); | [A]EP2988461 (MEDIATEK INC [TW]); | [A]EP3039942 (MEDIATEK SINGAPORE PTE LTD [SG]); | [A]EP3107208 (AMS INT AG [CH]) |