EP3672074 - CONFIGURABLE SWITCHED POWER AMPLIFIER FOR EFFICIENT HIGH/LOW OUTPUT POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP USA, Inc. 6501 William Cannon Drive West Austin TX 78735 / US | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANNELLA, Maicol c/o NXP Semiconductors IP Group 134 avenue du Général Eisenhower P.O. Box BP 72329 31023 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | 02 /
LARIE, Aurelien c/o NXP Semiconductors IP Group 134 avenue du Général Eisenhower P.O. Box BP 72329 31023 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | 03 /
DAL TOSO, Stefano c/o NXP Semiconductors IP Group 134 avenue du Général Eisenhower P.O. Box BP 72329 31023 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Richard NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 18306718.0 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672074 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3672074 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/193, H03F3/45, H03F1/02 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H03F1/0277 (EP,US);
H03F3/193 (EP);
H03F3/245 (US);
H03F3/45179 (EP,US);
H03F3/68 (US);
H03F2200/378 (US);
H03F2200/451 (EP,US);
H03F2200/513 (US);
H03F2200/516 (US);
H03F2200/546 (US);
H03F2203/21106 (US);
H03F2203/45024 (US);
H03F2203/45186 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | H03F3/45, H03F1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERBARER SCHALTLEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER FÜR EFFIZIENTE HOHE/NIEDRIGE AUSGANGSLEISTUNG | [2020/26] | English: | CONFIGURABLE SWITCHED POWER AMPLIFIER FOR EFFICIENT HIGH/LOW OUTPUT POWER | [2020/26] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE À COMMUTATION CONFIGURABLE POUR PUISSANCE DE SORTIE ÉLEVÉE/FAIBLE EFFICACE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 11.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | LU | 18.12.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
IT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5977828 (HU XIAOYUN [CA], et al) [X] 1,11 * column 4, line 10 - line 51; figure 4 *; | [XYI]US2008079499 (TSAI MING-LIN [TW]) [X] 1-5,7,9,11-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030]; figure 3 * [Y] 6 [I] 8,10; | [Y]US7474154 (LEE BUMHA [US], et al) [Y] 6* column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 8; figure 3 *; | [A]KR20180115404 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | Examination | US2011070848 | US2015340992 | US2017264250 | US2018083579 | US2018219516 |