EP3675500 - QUANTIZATION PARAMETER PREDICTION IN VIDEO ENCODING AND DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ya c/o Technicolor 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | 02 /
DE LAGRANGE, Philippe c/o Technicolor 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | 03 /
BORDES, Philippe c/o Technicolor 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | Huchet, Anne InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 18306839.4 | 24.12.2018 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675500 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/593, H04N19/463, H04N19/124, H04N19/96 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
H04N19/124 (EP);
H04N19/463 (EP);
H04N19/593 (EP);
H04N19/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUANTISIERUNGSPARAMETERVORHERSAGE BEI DER VIDEOCODIERUNG UND -DECODIERUNG | [2020/27] | English: | QUANTIZATION PARAMETER PREDICTION IN VIDEO ENCODING AND DECODING | [2020/27] | French: | PRÉDICTION DE PARAMÈTRES DE QUANTIFICATION POUR LE CODAGE ET LE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2014286403 (NISHITANI MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 16, 17 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0 21] , [ 165] - [0173] - [ 268] , [ 285] - [0290] * [Y] 1-9,12-14; | [Y]EP3399754 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) [Y] 1-9,12-14 * paragraphs [0058] - [0063] * * figures 8a-d *; | [XI]US2009296808 (REGUNATHAN SHANKAR [US], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0110] - [0114] - [ 124] - [0125] - [ 130] , [ 140] - [0141] - [ 150] * [I] 1,2,4,5,7-9,13,14; | [A] - BROSS B ET AL, "Versatile Video Coding (Draft 3)", no. JVET-L1001, (20181220), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L1001-v11.zip, (20181220), XP030200071 [A] 1-15 * section 8.4.1 * |