EP3560488 - COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING FEMALE SEXUAL DYSFUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Procare Health Iberia, S.L. Avda. Miguel Hernández 21, Bajo 46450 Benifaió / ES | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOSA DOMÍNGUEZ, Fernando Clinica Sagrada Familia Torras i Pujalt, 11-29 08022 BARCELONA / ES | 02 /
PALACIOS, Santiago Antonio Acuña, 9 28009 MADRID / ES | 03 /
GASLAIN, Yann Paseo Tramuntana, 89 00860 CASTELLDEFELS / ES | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 18382276.6 | 24.04.2018 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3560488 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K36/16, A61K36/18, A61K36/185, A61K36/48 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/2004 (EP,KR);
A61K36/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4415 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/455 (EP,US);
A61K31/51 (EP,US);
A61K31/525 (EP,KR,US);
A61K33/04 (EP,US);
A61K36/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/288 (KR);
A61K9/127 (US);
A61P15/00 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/455, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/51, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/525, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/04, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/16, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG WEIBLICHER SEXUELLER DYSFUNKTION | [2019/44] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING FEMALE SEXUAL DYSFUNCTION | [2019/44] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DYSFONCTION SEXUELLE FÉMININE | [2019/44] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03094943 (INDENA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * example 1 * * claims 1-10 * * page 2, line 18 - line 28 *; | [Y]US2014154346 (BHASKARAN SUNIL [IN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-20 * * examples 1, 2 * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0124] *; | [Y] - ROWLAND D L ET AL, "A REVIEW OF PLANT-DERIVED AND HERBAL APPROACHES TO THE TREATMENT OF SEXUAL DYSFUNCTIONS", JOURNAL OF SEX AND MARITAL THE, BRUNNER-MAZEL, INC, US, (20030101), vol. 29, no. 3, doi:10.1080/00926230390155096, ISSN 0092-623X, pages 185 - 205, XP008072607 [Y] 1-15 * table 3 * * page 191, paragraph 2 - page 192, paragraph 3 * * page 194, paragraph 2 - page 196, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00926230390155096 | by applicant | - DAVIS S.R. et al., "Efficacy and safety of testosterone in the management of hypoactive sexual desire disorder in postmenopausal women", J Sex Med, (20120000), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 1134 - 48 | - SIMON J.A. et al., "Efficacy and safety of flibanserin in postmenopausal women with hypoactive sexual desire disorder: results of the SNOWDROP trial", Menopause, (20140000), vol. 21, no. 6, pages 633 - 40 | - AFTAB A. et al., "Flibanserin and its discontents", Arch Womens Ment Health, (20170000), vol. 20, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1007/s00737-016-0693-6, pages 243 - 247, XP036174928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00737-016-0693-6 | - ROSEN R et al., "The female sexual function index (FSFI): a multidimensional self- report instrument for the assessment of female sexual function", J Sex Marital Ther, (20000000), vol. 26, pages 191 - 208 | - ROSEN R. et al., "The female sexual function index (FSFI): a multidimensional self-report instrument for the assessment of female sexual function", J Sex Marital Ther, (20000000), vol. 26, pages 191 - 208 |