EP3569411 - SPOUT POUCH AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Llc 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTINI, Luis Alberto Autovia Tarragona-Salou, s/n 43006 Tarragona / ES | 02 /
BOSKOVIC, Radisa Bachtobelstrasse 3 8810 Horgen / CH | 03 /
ROLAND SANDKUEHLER, Peter Hermann Bachtobelstrasse 3 8810 Horgen / CH | 04 /
PRADAS CORTINA, Ramón Calle Ocho, 25 Urb. Santa María de la Vall 08757 Corbera de Llobregat / ES | 05 /
NOGUÉ I ARBUSÀ, Martí Travessera de les Corts 39, EE 10º 2ª 08028 Barcelona / ES | 06 /
ALMOR MORUJO, Carlos Carrer Ferrán Junoy, 2, 5º 2ª 08030 Barcelona / ES | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18382344.2 | 18.05.2018 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3569411 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/30, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B27/36, B65D75/58 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B37/04 (US);
B29C65/02 (US);
B29C66/723 (US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/327 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B37/185 (US);
B32B7/027 (EP);
B65D47/06 (US);
B32B2250/05 (US);
B32B2250/24 (US);
B32B2250/242 (EP);
B32B2307/30 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP);
B32B2307/514 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2307/72 (EP,US);
B32B2323/043 (US);
B32B2323/046 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2329/04 (US);
B32B2377/00 (US);
B32B2439/40 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP);
B32B2439/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGUSSBEUTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/47] | English: | SPOUT POUCH AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2019/47] | French: | SACHET À EMBOUCHURE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/47] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9521743 (DU PONT CANADA [CA], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [YA]WO2016149259 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [Y] 1,15 * claim 1 * * figure - * [A] 2-14; | [YA]WO2017003773 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [Y] 1,15 * claims 1,9 * * example - * [A] 2-14 | by applicant | US3645992 | US3914342 | US4076698 | US4339507 | US4599392 | US5272236 | US5278272 | US5582923 | US5733155 | US5854045 | WO2017205168 | WO2018064027 |