EP3618179 - RADOME FOR VEHICLES AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAID RADOME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zanini Auto Grup, S.A. Po. Ind. Llevant Marineta, 2-5 08150 Parets del Vallés - Barcelona / ES | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASCARÓ HEREZA, Marçal ZANINI AUTO GRUP, S.A. Pol. Ind. Llevant Marineta, 2 08150 Parets Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | 02 /
CASANOVAS CEJUELA, Miquel Pol. Ind. Llevant Marineta, 2 08150 Parets Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | 03 /
SANAHUJA CLOT, José Pol. Ind. Llevant Marineta, 2 08150 Parets Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | 04 /
BOVER BALDERICH, Marc Pol. Ind. Llevant Marineta, 2 08150 Parets Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | 05 /
MAYER PUJADAS, Augusto Pol. Ind. Llevant Marineta, 2 08150 Parets Del Valles (Barcelona) / ES | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18382634.6 | 30.08.2018 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3618179 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3618179 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/02, H01Q1/42, H01Q1/32, G01S7/02 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H01Q1/422 (EP,CN,US);
H01Q1/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01S7/02 (CN);
G01S7/027 (EP,CN);
G01S7/4043 (KR);
H01Q1/3216 (KR);
H01Q1/3233 (EP,CN,US);
H01Q1/3283 (US);
H01Q1/42 (CN,KR);
H01Q1/425 (US);
G01S13/931 (US);
G01S2013/93271 (US);
G01S7/4047 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | H01Q1/02, H01Q1/32, H01Q1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RADARKUPPEL FÜR FAHRZEUGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER BESAGTEN RADARKUPPEL | [2020/10] | English: | RADOME FOR VEHICLES AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAID RADOME | [2020/10] | French: | RADÔME POUR VÉHICULES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CE RADÔME | [2020/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 04.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 30.08.2023 | LU | 30.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | GB | 12.10.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]DE102014002438 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [YD] 7,13 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0001] *[A] 11; | [XA]US2017352938 (OKUMURA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10,12,14 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0100] * [A] 11; | [XAYI]JP2018066705 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12,14,15 * figures 3, 6 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0044] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0109] * [A] 11 [Y] 7,13 [I] 3 | by applicant | DE19724320 | DE10156699 | US2006086710 | DE102013207482 | DE102014002438 | WO2017055182 |