EP3650466 - IN VITRO PRODUCTION OF HIGH AFFINITY MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas C/ Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ RIAÑO, Ana CENTRO DE BIOLOGIA MOLECULAR SEVERO OCHOA (CBM) Campus Universidad Autonoma De Madrid C/ Nicolas Cabrera, 1 28049 Madrid / ES | 02 /
ALARCON SANCHEZ, Balbino CENTRO DE BIOLOGIA MOLECULAR SEVERO OCHOA (CBM) Campus Universidad Autonoma De Madrid C/ Nicolas Cabrera, 1 28049 Madrid / ES | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | Pons Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18382799.7 | 12.11.2018 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650466 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C12N5/0781, C12N5/0783, A61K39/385, C07K14/77 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
A61K39/385 (EP);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4612 (EP);
A61K39/4622 (EP);
A61K39/4644 (EP);
C07K14/77 (EP,US);
C12N5/0635 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP);
A61K2239/38 (EP);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN-VITRO-HERSTELLUNG HOCHAFFINER MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER | [2020/20] | English: | IN VITRO PRODUCTION OF HIGH AFFINITY MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES | [2020/20] | French: | PRODUCTION IN VITRO D'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX À AFFINITÉ ÉLEVÉE | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 13.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US7943334 (AKIMOTO MASANOBU [JP], et al) [X] 16* claim 2 *; | [A]EP2574666 (PROTEALMMUN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2711021 (BLINK THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015117162 (UNIV SOUTH DAKOTA [US]) [A] 1,2,13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0008] - [0012] , [0023] , [0075]; claim 6 *; | [A] - D. PARRA ET AL, "Pivotal Advance: Peritoneal cavity B-1 B cells have phagocytic and microbicidal capacities and present phagocytosed antigen to CD4+ T cells", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, US, (20120401), vol. 91, no. 4, doi:10.1189/jlb.0711372, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 525 - 536, XP055574511 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 527, paragraph Antigen presentation assays * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1189/jlb.0711372 | [A] - ANA MARTÍNEZ-RIAÑO ET AL, "Antigen phagocytosis by B cells is required for a potent humoral response", EMBO REPORTS, (20180709), vol. 19, no. 9, doi:10.15252/embr.201846016, ISSN 1469-3178, page e46016, XP055574483 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figure 5 * * page 11, paragraph Materials and Methods - page 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.15252/embr.201846016 | [AD] - Takuya Nojima ET AL, "In-vitro derived germinal centre B cells differentially generate memory B or plasma cells in vivo", Nature communications, England, doi:10.1038/ncomms1475, (20110906), page 465, URL: http://www.nature.com/articles/ncomms1475.pdf, (20171017), XP055416496 [AD] 1,2,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms1475 | by applicant | US2010184148 | US2010323401 | WO2011023705 | US2016046907 | - NOJIMA et al., Nat Commun., (20110000), vol. 2, page 465 | - NAIR, S. et al., Curr Protoc Immunol., (20120000), vol. 0 7 | - DELGADO et al., Nat Immunol., (20090000), vol. 10, pages 880 - 888 | - VIGORITO, E. et al., Mol Cell Biol., (20040000), vol. 24, pages 719 - 729 | - SHIH, T.A. et al., Nat Immunol., (20020000), vol. 3, pages 399 - 406 | - BARNDEN, M.J. et al., Immunol Cell Biol., (19980000), vol. 76, pages 34 - 40 | - MOMBAERTS, P. et al., Cell, (19920000), vol. 68, pages 869 - 877 | - MARTINEZ-MARTIN, N. et al., Sci Signal., (20090000), vol. 2, page ra43 | - AIBA, Y., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (20100000), vol. 107, pages 12192 - 12197 |