EP3674418 - METHOD FOR MEASURING TELOMERE ASSOCIATED VARIABLES AND USES THEREOF FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND/OR PROGNOSIS OF TELOMERIC-ASSOCIATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Length S.L. Calle Miguel Ángel 11 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Najarro Parra, María Pilar Life Length S.L. Calle Miguel Ángel 11, 2nd floor 28010 MADRID / ES | 02 /
Fernández Canivell, Luis Life Length S.L. Calle Miguel Ángel 11, 2nd floor 28010 MADRID / ES | 03 /
Esteban la Fuente, Laura Life Length S.L. Calle Miguel Ángel 11, 2nd floor 28010 MADRID / ES | 04 /
De Pedro Montejo, Nuria Life Length S.L. Calle Miguel Ángel 11, 2nd floor 28010 MADRID / ES | 05 /
Diez Zaera, María Life Length S.L. Calle Miguel Ángel 11, 2nd floor 28010 MADRID / ES | 06 /
Garcia Martínez, Jorge Life Length S.L. Calle Miguel Ángel 11, 2nd floor 28010 MADRID / ES | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Pons Ariño, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Rubén Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18382992.8 | 26.12.2018 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3674418 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6841, G16B5/00 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6841 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6851 (US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (US);
C12Q2600/166 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6841, C12Q2525/204, C12Q2537/16, C12Q2537/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON TELOMERASSOZIIERTEN VARIABLEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON ZUR DIAGNOSE UND/ODER PROGNOSE VON TELOMERASSOZIIERTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2020/27] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING TELOMERE ASSOCIATED VARIABLES AND USES THEREOF FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND/OR PROGNOSIS OF TELOMERIC-ASSOCIATED DISEASES | [2020/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE VARIABLES ASSOCIÉS À UN TÉLOMÈRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET/OU LE PRONOSTIC DE MALADIES ASSOCIÉES À UN TÉLOMÈRE | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US8084203 (FLORES HERNANDEZ IGNACIO [ES], et al) [I] 3,4 * examples 4,5 *; | [I]WO2013102116 (TELOME HEALTH INC [US]) [I] 3,4 * claims 60,68 *; | [I]WO2014085632 (GERON CORP [US]) [I] 3,4 * claims 1-3 *; | [X] - GERALDINE AUBERT ET AL, "Telomere length measurementCaveats and a critical assessment of the available technologies and tools", MUTATION RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 730, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.MRFMMM.2011.04.003, ISSN 0027-5107, (20110406), pages 59 - 67, (20110413), XP028436152 [X] 1,2,5-13 * page 61 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mrfmmm.2011.04.003 | [A] - JEANETTE E ECKEL-PASSOW ET AL, "Software comparison for evaluating genomic copy number variation for Affymetrix 6.0 SNP array platform", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20110531), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2105-12-220, ISSN 1471-2105, page 220, XP021102541 [A] 1 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-12-220 | by applicant | - HEMANN, M.T. et al., Cell, (20010000), vol. 107, no. 1, pages 67 - 77 | - VERA E. et al., Cell Rep., (20121025), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 732 - 7 | - CANELA A. et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (20070327), vol. 104, no. 13, pages 5300 - 5 |