EP3689847 - CATALYTIC AND CONTINUOUS THERMOCHEMICAL PROCESS OF PRODUCTION OF VALUABLE DERIVATIVES FROM ORGANIC MATERIALS AND WASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secil-Companhia Geral de Cal e Cimento S.A. Av. Forças Armadas, 125-6° 1600-079 Lisboa / PT | For all designated states Instituto Superior Técnico Avenida Rovisco Pais, 1 1049-001 Lisboa / PT | [2023/14] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states CMP-Cimentos Maceira e Pataias S.A. Maceira-Liz 2405-019 Maceira Lra / PT | ||
For all designated states Instituto Superior Técnico Avenida Rovisco Pais, 1 1049-001 Lisboa / PT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Sequeira Serra Nunes, Ângela Maria Jesus RUA Luís DE Camões, 19 2925-181 Azeitão / PT | 02 /
Bordado, João Carlos Moura AV.Rovisco Pais, 2° DTO 1000-268 Lisboa / PT | 03 /
De Assis Teixeira Neiva Correia, Maria Joana@Castelo-Branco RUA João Infante, Lote4 - 3° C 2750-384 Cascais / PT | 04 /
Dos Santos Mateus, Maria Margarida Pires AV. Padre Bartolomeu DE Gusmão 18, r/c Dto 2720-428 Amadora / PT | 05 /
Dos Santos Lopes, RUI Miguel Galhano Praceta António Sérgio, 56 - 2° Frente 2775-158 Parede / PT | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Pereira da Cruz, Joao J. Pereira da Cruz, S.A. Rua Victor Cordon, 10-A 1249-103 Lisboa / PT | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18398010.1 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/32] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689847 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/00, C07C51/48, C07C59/185, C07C59/08, C07D307/46, C07D307/50, C07H1/08, C10G1/08, C10G21/06 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
C07D307/50 (EP);
C07C51/00 (EP);
C07C51/48 (EP);
C07D307/46 (EP);
C07H1/08 (EP);
C10G1/086 (EP);
C10G21/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/00, C07C59/08 (EP);
C07C51/00, C07C59/185 (EP);
C07C51/48, C07C59/08 (EP);
C07C51/48, C07C59/185 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | 05.02.2021 | MD | Not yet paid | TN | 05.02.2021 | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHES UND KONTINUIERLICHES THERMOCHEMISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WERTVOLLEN DERIVATIVE AUS ORGANISCHEN MATERIALIEN UND ABFÄLLEN | [2020/32] | English: | CATALYTIC AND CONTINUOUS THERMOCHEMICAL PROCESS OF PRODUCTION OF VALUABLE DERIVATIVES FROM ORGANIC MATERIALS AND WASTE | [2020/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ THERMOCHIMIQUE CATALYTIQUE ET CONTINU DE PRODUCTION DE DÉRIVÉS PROFITABLES À PARTIR DE MATIÈRES ORGANIQUES ET DE DÉCHETS | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/32] | 05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 05.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2489780 (RWTH AACHEN [DE]) [X] 1,3,14,16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0018] - paragraphs [0020] , [0025] , [0033] , [0042] , [0043]; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [I] 2,4-13,15; | [XI]US5730837 (BLACK STUART K [US], et al) [X] 16 * column 4, line 18 - line 29; claims 1,4-7 * * column 3, line 29 - line 36 * [I] 1-14; | [XI]FR1235092 (MCKEE DEV CORP) [X] 16 * page 3, column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 5; figure 1 * [I] 15 | by applicant | PT108816 | WO2014087015 | US9073841 |