EP3539865 - FAN BLADE SUPPORT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ge Avio S.r.l. Via I Maggio, 99 10040 Rivalta di Torino (TO) / IT | [2021/10] |
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Ge Avio S.r.l. Via I Maggio, 99 Rivalta di Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donnini, Andrea c/o GE Avio S.r.l. Via I Maggio 56/108 10040 Rivalta di Torino / IT | 02 /
Lercara, Davide c/o GE Avio S.r.l. Via I Maggio 56/108 10040 Rivalta di Torino / IT | 03 /
Bordoni, Alessandro c/o GE Avio S.r.l. Via I Maggio 56/108 10040 Rivalta di Torino / IT | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2019/38] | Application number, filing date | 18425013.2 | 12.03.2018 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539865 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64C11/02, B64C27/32 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
B64C11/02 (EP,US);
B64C11/04 (US);
B64C27/32 (EP,US);
B64D35/00 (US);
F01D11/003 (US);
F01D5/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÜFTERSCHAUFELSTÜTZANORDNUNG | [2019/38] | English: | FAN BLADE SUPPORT ASSEMBLY | [2019/38] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE SUPPORT DE PALE DE ROTOR OU D'HELICE | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 04.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/50] | 28.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2631453 (LARSEN AGNEW E, et al) [A] 1,17* figure 1 *; | [XI]US2727577 (DE MUTH RUSSELL T) [X] 1,2,6-9,12-18 * figure 1 * [I] 4; | [XY]GB828132 (WILHELM GUSTAV STOECKICHT) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,12-18 * figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [YA]US3799473 (BORTEL V) [Y] 3 * figure 1 * [A] 17 |