EP3573071 - AN ELECTROCARDIOGRAPHY TELEMETRY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zieba, Bogumil Inovatica Bogumil Zieba Al. Tadeusza Kosciuzki 80/82 90-437 Lodz / PL | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 18461558.1 | 23.05.2018 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573071 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/67, A41D13/12, A61B5/0402, A61B5/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
G16H40/67 (EP);
A61B5/0006 (EP);
A61B5/318 (EP);
A61B5/6804 (EP);
A41D13/1281 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROKARDIOGRAPHIE-TELEMETRIESYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/48] | English: | AN ELECTROCARDIOGRAPHY TELEMETRY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/48] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TÉLÉMÉTRIE D'ÉLECTROCARDIOGRAPHIE | [2019/48] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3158928 (BOMDIC INC [TW]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0017] - [0080] *; | [Y]US2016095527 (THNG FLORENCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0022] - [0036] - [0053] , [0054] * * paragraphs [0065] , [0065] , [0080] , [0081] , [0111] *; | [Y]US2014135593 (JAYALTH DHANANJA [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0030] - [0052] * | by applicant | US2013283256 |