EP3657055 - FLUID VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. 14300 Judicial Road Burnsville, MN 55306-4898 / US | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosta ski, Piotr UTC Aerospace Systems Wroc aw sp. z o.o. u. Zielona 9 52-116 Iwiny / PL | 02 /
WILK, Tomasz UTC Aerospace Systems Wroc aw sp. z o.o. ul. Waniliowa 28/4 51-180 Wroc aw / PL | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 18461627.4 | 22.11.2018 | [2020/22] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657055 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/083 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
F16K11/083 (EP);
F16K11/0836 (EP,US);
F16K27/062 (US);
Y10T137/86863 (US);
Y10T137/86871 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSVENTIL | [2020/22] | English: | FLUID VALVE | [2020/22] | French: | VANNE DE LIQUIDE | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 27.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE801827 (GUSTAV FRIEDRICH GERDTS) [X] 1,2,7,9,10,14,15 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - page 2, column 2, line 100; figure 1 *; | [X]FR1047328 (REALISATIONS TECH ROUTIERES RE) [X] 1,2,7-12,14,15* the whole document *; | [X]US4410003 (SANDLING MICHAEL J [GB]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * column 2, line 63 - column 12, line 61; figures 1-20 * |