EP3565659 - DEVICE FOR INJECTING AND MIXING A REACTIVE FLUID IN HIGH PRESSURE LDPE PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOLOZA PORRAS, Carolina De Los Angeles c/o SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 02 /
CASTANEDA ZUNIGA, Diego Mauricio c/o SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 03 /
BAI, Hua SABIC Technology Center 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land 77478 / US | 04 /
BODEGOM VAN, Robert Cornelis c/o. SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 05 /
NIKKHOO, Mohsen SABIC Technology Center 1600 Industrial Blvd. Sugar Land 77478 / US | 06 /
MEGENS, Bas, Eugène, Hans c/o SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 18700054.2 | 04.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018EP50195 | Priority number, date | EP20170150517 | 06.01.2017 Original published format: EP 17150517 | US201762492478P | 01.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762492478 P | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127533 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565659 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3565659 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/04, B01J4/00 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
B01J4/002 (EP,US);
B01F25/3133 (EP,US);
B01J19/06 (US);
B01J19/26 (US);
C08F10/02 (US);
B01F2101/2204 (US);
F16J15/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSPRITZEN UND MISCHEN EINES REAKTIVEN FLUIDS IN HOCHDRUCK-LDPE-VERFAHREN | [2021/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR INJECTING AND MIXING A REACTIVE FLUID IN HIGH PRESSURE LDPE PROCESSES | [2019/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION ET DE MÉLANGE D'UN FLUIDE RÉACTIF DANS DES PROCESSUS LDPE HAUTE PRESSION | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/46] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM INJIZIEREN UND MISCHEN EINES REAKTIVEN FLUIDS IN HOCHDRUCK-LDPE-PROZESSE | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 15.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.01.2022 | AT | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | ES | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | NL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 26.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2016195050 (GREEN JASON E [US]) [X] 1,3-5,11 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] * * figure - * [A] 6-10,12-15 [I] 2; | [IA]SE1050194 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [I] 1-11 * figures 1,4,8 * [A] 12-15; | [IA]US2015157991 (BEG MIRZA NAJAM ALI [GB], et al) [I] 1-4,9,11 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 3,4B * [A] 5-8,10,12-15; | [A]DE202010017478U (INFRACOR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * figure - * | Examination | FR2001694 | FR2550098 | SE534822 | by applicant | EP0207161 | US8308087 | EP1711256 | - ANDREW PEACOCK, Handbook of Polyethylene, Dekker, (20000000), pages 43 - 66 |