EP3571131 - DEGRADABLE SHEET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polymateria Limited First floor Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London, Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLIS, Christopher Polymateria Limited First Floor Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB | 02 /
CHAPMAN, Graham Polymateria Limited First Floor Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB | 03 /
HILL, Gavin Polymateria Limited First Floor Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 18700139.1 | 08.01.2018 | [2019/48] | WO2018EP50375 | Priority number, date | EP20170152496 | 20.01.2017 Original published format: EP 17152496 | EP20170152497 | 20.01.2017 Original published format: EP 17152497 | [2019/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018134071 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571131 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3571131 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/46, C08K3/26, C08K5/00, C08K5/09, C08K5/101 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
C08K5/0008 (EP,KR);
C08K3/26 (EP,KR);
C08J5/18 (KR,US);
B65D1/265 (KR);
B65D65/466 (EP,KR,US);
C08J11/10 (KR);
C08J11/105 (KR);
C08J11/14 (KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08K5/09 (EP,KR);
C08K5/098 (KR);
C08K5/101 (EP,KR);
C08K5/13 (KR);
C08L21/00 (KR);
C08L23/06 (KR,US);
C08L23/12 (KR,US);
C08L25/10 (KR);
C08L3/02 (KR);
C08J2323/06 (US);
C08J2323/12 (US);
C08J2403/02 (US);
C08J2409/06 (US);
C08K2003/265 (EP,KR);
C08K2201/005 (KR);
C08K2201/014 (EP);
C08L2201/06 (US);
C08L2205/03 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/26, C08L23/04 (EP);
C08K3/26, C08L23/10 (EP);
C08K5/0008, C08L23/04 (EP);
C08K5/0008, C08L23/10 (EP);
C08K5/09, C08L23/04 (EP);
C08K5/09, C08L23/10 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABBAUBARES BLATTMATERIAL | [2019/48] | English: | DEGRADABLE SHEET MATERIAL | [2019/48] | French: | MATÉRIAU EN FEUILLE DÉGRADABLE | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 30.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5565503 (GARCIA RODRIGO A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 5, lines 44-48, 51-57 * * example 12 *; | [A]US2003190443 (MCCARTHY DONALD C [US]) [A] 1-17 * example - * * claim - *; | [A]US2004062884 (HAO BENZHONG [CN]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0013] * * example 2 ** claim 1 *; | [A]US2012071574 (MACLEOD MATHEW D [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0023] * * claims 1,2,13 *; | [A]US2012267368 (WU WEN PAO [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * examples 9-11,18-20 * * claims 1,24 * | by applicant | US4016117 | US4931488 |