EP3740234 - METHOD FOR ADAPTING INFLUENZA VIRUSES TO VERO CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yisheng Biopharma (Singapore) Pte Ltd Serangoon Central Post Office PO Box 584 Singapore 915503 / SG | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yi c/o Yisheng Biopharma (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. Serangoon Central Post Office PO Box 584 Singapore 915503 / SG | 02 /
YAN, Yuhe c/o Yisheng Biopharma (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. Serangoon Central Post Office PO Box 584 Singapore 915503 / SG | 03 /
ZHANG, Xu c/o Yisheng Biopharma (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. Serangoon Central Post Office PO Box 584 Singapore 915503 / SG | 04 /
COTON, Thomas Anthony c/o Yisheng Biopharma (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. Serangoon Central Post Office PO Box 584 Singapore 915503 / SG | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18700956.8 | 18.01.2018 | [2020/48] | WO2018SG50030 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143291 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740234 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61K39/145, C12N7/00, A61P31/16 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16151 (EP);
C12N2760/16152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANPASSUNG VON INFLUENZA-VIREN AN VERO-ZELLEN | [2020/48] | English: | METHOD FOR ADAPTING INFLUENZA VIRUSES TO VERO CELLS | [2020/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ADAPTATION DES VIRUS DE LA GRIPPE À DES CELLULES VERO | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 17.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9738094 (ST JUDE CHILDRENS RES HOSPITAL [US]); | [YD]US2008187546 (WASMOEN TERRI L [US], et al); | by applicant | US2008187546 |