EP3743539 - EVAPORATOR FOR EVAPORATING A SOURCE MATERIAL, MATERIAL DEPOSITION SOURCE, DEPOSITION APPARATUS AND METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMSTRONG, Claire Kirchbergstr. 10 63755 Alzenau / DE | 02 /
SCHNAPPENBERGER, Frank Heppenberg 19 63867 Johannesberg / DE | 03 /
DEPPISCH, Thomas An den Bornwiesen 11 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | 04 /
DIEGUEZ-CAMPO, Jose Manuel Hergerswiesenweg 11 63457 Hanau / DE | 05 /
MAURISCHAT, Anja Mühlstr. 13 63768 Hösbach / DE | 06 /
SCHLÄFER, Susanne Die Spitzenwiesen 19 63654 Büdingen / DE | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 18701455.0 | 23.01.2018 | [2020/49] | WO2018EP51540 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019145014 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743539 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/24, C23C14/26, C23C14/12, C23C14/56 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
C23C14/243 (EP);
C23C14/12 (EP);
C23C14/26 (EP);
C23C14/562 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | VERDAMPFER ZUM VERDAMPFEN EINES QUELLENMATERIALS, MATERIALABSCHEIDUNGSQUELLE, ABSCHEIDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/49] | English: | EVAPORATOR FOR EVAPORATING A SOURCE MATERIAL, MATERIAL DEPOSITION SOURCE, DEPOSITION APPARATUS AND METHODS THEREFOR | [2020/49] | French: | ÉVAPORATEUR POUR L'ÉVAPORATION D'UN MATÉRIAU SOURCE, SOURCE DE DÉPÔT DE MATÉRIAU, APPAREIL DE DÉPÔT ET PROCÉDÉS S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 21.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH04236769 (ULVAC CORP) [X] 1-6,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0007]; figures 1,3 *; | [XY]US2004042770 (CHOE YUN SOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,14 * paragraphs [0036] , [0038]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0059] * [Y] 13; | [A]US2010173067 (UKIGAYA NOBUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0099]; figure 7 *; | [Y]WO2017033053 (FLISOM AG [CH], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2017175250 (HU HAIBING [CN]) [X] 1,7,8 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0031] *; | [X]WO2017128471 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,14 * paragraph [0033]; figure 2 * |