EP3568500 - LEAD-FREE PATENTING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/47] | LEAD-FREE PATENTING PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT | ||
[2023/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NV Bekaert SA Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESPLONT, Christophe 106 Rue du vert pré 59420 Mouvaux / FR | 02 /
BRUGGEMAN, Tim Blauwpoort 9 8501 Heule / BE | 03 /
BEYENS, Franky Kastanjeboomstraat 1 8550 Zwevegem / BE | 04 /
HOLVOET, Jan Otegemse Steenweg 82 8540 Deerlijk / BE | 05 /
LAPEIRE, Gregory Leuricock 66 8560 Wevelgem / BE | [2019/47] | Representative(s) | Serwas, Harry NV Bekaert SA IPD - PC6030 Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | [2023/23] |
Former [2019/47] | Messely, Marc NV Bekaert SA IPD - PC6030 Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 18701671.2 | 09.01.2018 | [2019/47] | WO2018EP50388 | Priority number, date | EP20170151117 | 12.01.2017 Original published format: EP 17151117 | [2019/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018130498 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3568500 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3568500 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/52, C21D9/573, C21D1/63, C21D1/64 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
C21D1/63 (EP);
C21D1/64 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/5732 (US);
C21D9/52 (EP);
C21D9/54 (EP,KR);
C21D9/573 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLEIFREIES PATENTIERVERFAHREN | [2023/04] | English: | LEAD-FREE PATENTING PROCESS | [2023/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PATENTAGE SANS PLOMB | [2023/04] |
Former [2019/47] | BLEIFREIES PATENTIERVERFAHREN UND AUSRÜSTUNG | ||
Former [2019/47] | LEAD-FREE PATENTING PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT | ||
Former [2019/47] | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE PATENTAGE SANS PLOMB | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 14.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/22] | DK | 07.06.2023 | |
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | EE | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YDA]EP0524689 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) [YD] 13-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-12; | [A]CN1814823 (ZHUGUANG MACHINERY CO LTD SHAN [CN]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-2; examples 1-6 *; | [A]US8506878 (TYL THOMAS W [US]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-10; claims 1-27 *; | [YDA]WO2014118089 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) [YD] 13-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-12 | by applicant | GB1276738 | EP0216434 | EP0524689 | WO2007023696 | WO2014118089 |