EP3583552 - ACTIVE LEARNING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Twitter, Inc. 1355 Market Street Suite 900 San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSZAR, Ferenc Twitter Inc. 1355 Market Street Suite 900 San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 02 /
BERKES, Pietro Twitter Inc. 1355 Market Street Suite 900 San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 03 /
WANG, Zehan Twitter Inc. 1355 Market Street Suite 900 San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Kennedy, Richard E., et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 18702889.9 | 23.01.2018 | [2019/52] | WO2018US14817 | Priority number, date | US201762460459P | 17.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762460459 P | US201815876906 | 22.01.2018 Original published format: US201815876906 | [2019/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018151909 | Date: | 23.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3583552 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06F17/30 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06N7/01 (EP,US);
G06F16/22 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06F16/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | AKTIVES LERNSYSTEM | [2019/52] | English: | ACTIVE LEARNING SYSTEM | [2019/52] | French: | SYSTÈME D'APPRENTISSAGE ACTIF | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 29.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010063948 (VIRKAR HEMANT [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012095943 (YANKOV DRAGOMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [I] - M. PAZ SESMERO ET AL, "Generating ensembles of heterogeneous classifiers using Stacked Generalization", WILEY INTERDISCIPLINARY REVIEWS: DATA MINING AND KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY, (20150128), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1002/widm.1143, ISSN 1942-4787, pages 21 - 34, XP055310680 [I] 1-21 * page 21 - page 32, column r, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/widm.1143 | [A] - Melanie Ducoffe ET AL, "QBDC: Query by dropout committee for training deep supervised architecture", (20151119), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1511.06412.pdf, (20180417), XP055467786 [A] 1-21 * page 1 - page 8 * | [A] - KIM BO-KYEONG ET AL, "Hierarchical committee of deep convolutional neural networks for robust facial expression recognition", JOURNAL ON MULTIMODAL USER INTERFACES, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S12193-015-0209-0, ISSN 1783-7677, (20160116), pages 173 - 189, (20160116), XP035981942 [A] 1-21 * page 173 - page 187, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12193-015-0209-0 | [A] - Neil Houlsby ET AL, "Bayesian Active Learning for Classification and Preference Learning", (20111224), URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/7486/e148260329785fb347ac6725bd4123d8dad6.pdf, (20180417), XP055467781 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | by applicant | - HOULSBY et al., Bayesian Active Learning for Classification and Preference Learning, (20110000), URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/7486/el48260329785fb347ac6725bd4123d8dad6.pdf |