EP3577924 - A METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AN EXISTING SUBSCRIPTION PROFILE FROM A MOBILE NETWORK OPERATOR TO A SECURE ELEMENT, CORRESPONDING SERVERS AND SECURE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Dis France SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Thales Dis France SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANSLOT, Michel C/O Gemalto SA Intellectual Property y Department 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
LAMBERTON, Marc C/O Gemalto SA Intellectual Property y Department 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Scheer, Luc Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Scheer, Luc Thales Dis France SA Intellectual Property Department 525, avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18703005.1 | 02.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018EP52631 | Priority number, date | EP20170305124 | 03.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17305124 | EP20170305204 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17305204 | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018141896 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577924 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/20, H04W8/26, H04W12/069, H04W12/30, // H04W8/18, H04W4/42 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
H04W8/205 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04L61/4588 (EP);
H04L61/5061 (US);
H04L61/5092 (US);
H04L63/0853 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04W12/04 (US);
H04W12/041 (KR,US);
H04W12/06 (KR,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W12/35 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/50 (US);
H04W4/70 (US);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (US);
H04W8/265 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2101/654 (US);
H04W12/42 (EP,US);
H04W60/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/50] | H04W8/20, H04W8/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES BESTEHENDEN TEILNEHMERPROFILS VON EINEM MOBILFUNKNETZBETREIBER AN EIN SICHERES ELEMENT, ENTSPRECHENDE SERVER UND SICHERES ELEMENT | [2019/50] | English: | A METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING AN EXISTING SUBSCRIPTION PROFILE FROM A MOBILE NETWORK OPERATOR TO A SECURE ELEMENT, CORRESPONDING SERVERS AND SECURE ELEMENT | [2019/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'UN PROFIL D'ABONNEMENT EXISTANT DEPUIS UN OPÉRATEUR DE RÉSEAU MOBILE À UN ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ, SERVEURS CORRESPONDANTS ET ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ | [2021/41] |
Former [2019/50] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'UN PROFIL D'ABONNEMENT EXISTANT D'UN OPÉRATEUR DE RÉSEAU MOBILE À UN ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ, SERVEURS CORRESPONDANTS ET ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 03.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP2461613 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [X] 7,8 * paragraph [0217] * * paragraph [0213] * [A] 1-6; | [A]WO2013039900 (ALCATEL LUCENT USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 20 - page 7, line 14; figure 1 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 18; figure 3 *; | [XA]WO2015018531 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 7,8 * page 1, lines 5-10 * * page 2, lines 5-21 * * page 12, lines 3-12 * * page 13, lines 4-8 * * page 15, line 21 - page 16, line 6 * [A] 1-6; | [XA]EP3035724 (TELEFÓNICA S A [ES]) [X] 7,8 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] * [A] 1-6; | [AD] - GSMA, "GSM Association Non-confidential Official Document SGP.21 -RSP Architecture Security Classification: Non-confidential", (20160823), URL: https://www.gsma.com/rsp/wp-content/uploads/docs_1/SGP.21_v2.0-Architecture.pdf, (20170906), XP055404424 [AD] 1-8 * page 76 * | [XA] - Gsm Association, "Remote Provisioning Architecture for Embedded UICC - Technical Specification - Version 3.1", (20160527), URL: http://www.gsma.com/newsroom/wp-content/uploads//SGP.02_v3.1.pdf, (20161123), XP055322069 [X] 7,8 * chapters 3.1 - 3.12 * [A] 1-6 |