EP3577021 - AERODYNAMIC OR HYDRODYNAMIC BLADE MADE OF LAYERED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InfraCore IP B.V. Oostdijk 25 3077 CP Rotterdam / NL | [2021/15] |
Former [2020/51] | For all designated states FiberCore IP B.V. Oostdijk 25 3077 CP Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states Fibercore Ip B.v. Oostdijk 25 3077 CP Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEETERS, Johannes Hendricus Alphonsus Oostdijk 25 3077 CP Rotterdam / NL | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18703865.8 | 31.01.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018NL50068 | Priority number, date | NL20172018263 | 31.01.2017 Original published format: NL 2018263 | [2019/50] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018143802 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577021 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3577021 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64C3/18, B64C3/24, B64C11/24, B64C27/473 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
B64C3/18 (EP);
F01D5/282 (US);
B29D99/0025 (EP);
B32B15/20 (US);
B63H1/26 (EP);
B64C11/24 (EP);
B64C11/26 (EP,US);
B64C27/473 (EP,US);
B64C3/20 (EP,US);
B64C3/24 (EP);
B64C9/00 (EP);
C04B35/62695 (US);
F01D5/12 (US);
F01D5/14 (US);
F03D1/0675 (EP);
C04B35/628 (US);
C04B35/62802 (US);
C04B35/62805 (US);
C04B35/62815 (US);
C04B41/4505 (US);
C04B41/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS GESCHICHTETEM MATERIAL GEFERTIGTE AERODYNAMISCHE ODER HYDRODYNAMISCHE SCHAUFEL | [2019/50] | English: | AERODYNAMIC OR HYDRODYNAMIC BLADE MADE OF LAYERED MATERIAL | [2019/50] | French: | PALE AÉRODYNAMIQUE OU HYDRODYNAMIQUE COMPOSÉE D'UN MATÉRIAU STRATIFIÉ | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 16.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2018 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 31.01.2018 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB245408 (RENAULT LOUIS) [X] 1-6,8,10,13-16,20,23,29,30,33 * the whole document * [I] 19,21,22,28,31,32; | [Y]US2827967 (SCHLIEKELMANN ROBERT J) [Y] 7,9 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 14; figure - *; | [A]US4105817 (DUNAHOO EDMOND O) [A] 1-33* column 6, lines 42-7 - column 7, line 33; examples 10,13 *; | [I]DE19836629 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [I] 1-6,8,10,13-18,20-23,28-30,32,33 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 52; figure - *; | [XYI]EP1070661 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,10,13-17,22,23,30,33 * paragraphs [0057] - [0071]; figures 10-14 * [Y] 7,9 [I] 12,18,20,21,24-29,31,32 | by applicant | US2410609 | US2827967 | US2003116262 | EP2182203 | EP2363602 | US2013068389 | US2013101430 | US2014284431 | GB2528850 |