EP3585764 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF UNSATURATED CARBOXYLIC ACIDS BY CARBONYLATION OF ALLYL ALCOHOLS AND THEIR ACYLATION PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHELWIES, Mathias Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
PACIELLO, Rocco Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
PELZER, Ralf Chemiestr. 22 68623 Lampertheim / DE | 04 /
SIEGEL, Wolfgang Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2021/04] |
Former [2020/01] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 18704024.1 | 13.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018EP53535 | Priority number, date | EP20170157950 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17157950 | [2020/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018153727 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3585764 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3585764 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/08, C07C51/09, C07C51/12, C07C51/353, C07C57/00, C07C57/03, C07C57/26, C07C69/52, C07D307/92, C12P7/40, C12P7/62 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
C07C51/12 (EP,CN);
C07C67/08 (EP,CN);
C07D307/92 (EP,CN,US);
C07C51/09 (EP,CN);
C07C51/353 (EP,CN);
C12P41/005 (EP,CN);
C12P7/40 (EP,CN);
C12P7/62 (EP,CN);
C07B2200/09 (EP,CN);
C07C2601/14 (EP,CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/09, C07C57/00 (CN,EP);
C07C51/12, C07C57/03 (CN,EP);
C07C51/12, C07C57/26 (CN,EP);
C07C51/353, C07C57/03 (CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON UNGESÄTTIGTEN CARBONSÄUREN DURCH CARBONYLIERUNG VON ALLYLALKOHOLEN UND DEREN ACYLIERUNGSPRODUKTEN | [2020/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF UNSATURATED CARBOXYLIC ACIDS BY CARBONYLATION OF ALLYL ALCOHOLS AND THEIR ACYLATION PRODUCTS | [2020/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES INSATURÉS PAR CARBONYLATION D'ALCOOLS ALLYLIQUES ET LEURS PRODUITS D'ACYLATION | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 24.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21153270.0 / EP3854777 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2018 | AL | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | IT | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | MT | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SE | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | IE | 13.02.2021 | LU | 13.02.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 13.02.2018 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.02.2018 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 13.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 27.01.2021 | |
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | CZ | 27.01.2021 | |
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 27.01.2021 | |
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 13.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [I]DE2217534 (HOECHST AG) [I] 2,4-6,11-13,16-18* the whole document *; | [IDA]EP0428979 (DU PONT [US]) [ID] 2,4-6,11-13,16-18,23 * the whole document * [A] 1,3,7-10,14,15,19-22,24-26; | [A]DE4301555 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,3-26 * column 4, lines 11-51 *; | [XAI]US6015923 (BURKE PATRICK MICHAEL [US]) [X] 2,4,13,16,17 * the whole document * [A] 24-26 [I] 5,6,11,15,18,23 | by applicant | EP0146859 | US4801743 | EP0428979 | WO9206063 | WO2010139719 | WO2012066059 | WO2015061764 | - BERTLEFF, W.; ROEPER, M.; SAVA, X, Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemsitry, Wiley-VCH, (20120000), vol. 7, pages 74 - 98 | - TSUJI et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19640000), vol. 86, pages 4350 - 4353 | - B. GABRIELE et al., Journal of Molecular Catalysis A, (19960000), vol. 111, pages 43 - 48 | - E. NEGISHI, Handbook of Organopalladium Chemistry for Organic Synthesis, Wiley-VCH, (20020000), vol. 2, pages 2505 - 2517 | - ACS Catal., (20140000), vol. 4, pages 2977 - 2989 | - Tetrahedron: Asymmetry, (20090000), vol. 20, pages 1637 - 1640 | - JOC, (19880000), vol. 53, pages 3832 - 3828 | - Tetrahedron Letters, (19880000), vol. 29, pages 4945 - 4948 | - JOC, (19930000), vol. 58, pages 1538 - 1545 | - Ullmanns Enzyklopädie der technischen Chemie, 3. Auflage, (19510000), vol. 1, page 769 ff | - MOOKHERJEE et al., Perfumer and Flavourist, (19900000), vol. 15, page 27 | - P. F. VLAD, "Khimiya Geterotsik/icheskikh Soedinenii", Engl. Trans!, (19910000), page 746 | - H. YAMAMOTO et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20020000), page 3647 | - SNYDER et al., Angew. Chem., (20090000), vol. 121, page 8039 | - WIRTH et al., Org. Lett., (20070000), vol. 9, page 3169 | EP20160156410 | EP20170157974 |