EP3586228 - ELEMENT BY VECTOR OPERATIONS IN A DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGKLIS, Grigorios c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | 02 /
STEPHENS, Nigel John c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | 03 /
EAPEN, Jacob c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | 04 /
EYOLE, Mbou c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | 05 /
MANSELL, David Hennah c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18704067.0 | 02.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018GB50311 | Priority number, date | GR20170100081 | 23.02.2017 Original published format: GR 20170100081 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018154273 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586228 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3586228 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G06F9/30036 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F9/3001 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F17/16 (IL,US);
G06F9/30043 (IL,US);
G06F9/30101 (IL,US);
G06F9/30109 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEMENT-NACH-VEKTOR-OPERATIONEN IN EINER DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/01] | English: | ELEMENT BY VECTOR OPERATIONS IN A DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2020/01] | French: | OPÉRATIONS SUR ÉLÉMENTS PAR VECTEURS DANS UN APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 09.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | IT | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005125631 (SYMES DOMINIC H [GB], et al); | [Y]EP2584460 (ST ERICSSON SA [CH]); | [Y]US2014208079 (BRADBURY JONATHAN D [US]) |