EP3580340 - POTENT AND SHORT PROMOTER FOR EXPRESSION OF HETEROLOGOUS GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUNDERLICH, Kerstin Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | 02 /
UIL, Taco, Gilles Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | 03 /
VELLINGA, Jort Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | 04 /
SANDERS, Barbara, Petronella Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | 05 /
VAN DER VLUGT, Remko Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Beslier, Victor Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 18704528.1 | 08.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018EP53201 | Priority number, date | EP20170155338 | 09.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17155338 | EP20170163245 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17163245 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018146205 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580340 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/861 (US);
C07K14/005 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2710/16122 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | POTENTER UND KURZER PROMOTER ZUR EXPRESSION VON HETEROLOGEN GENEN | [2019/51] | English: | POTENT AND SHORT PROMOTER FOR EXPRESSION OF HETEROLOGOUS GENES | [2019/51] | French: | PROMOTEUR PUISSANT ET COURT POUR L'EXPRESSION DE GÈNES HÉTÉROLOGUES | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 08.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009181424 (ALBERICIO FERNANDO [ES], et al) [A] 1-25 * Whole doc., especially Fig.6,7; para. [0003,0006]; examples *; | [A]US2012190106 (YAO FENG [US]) [A] 1-25 * Abstract, para. [0005, 0007, 0011, 0017] *; | [A] - "Aotine herpesvirus 1 strain S34E, complete genome.", EMBL, (20090607), Database accession no. FJ483970, URL: EBI, XP002769200 [A] 1-25 * sequence . * | [A] - FOECKING M K ET AL, "Powerful and versatile enhancer-promoter unit for mammalian expression vectors", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 45, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(86)90137-X, ISSN 0378-1119, (19860101), pages 101 - 105, (19860101), XP025688566 [A] 1-25 * Whole doc., especially Fig.1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(86)90137-X | [A] - ADDISON CL ET AL, "Comparison of the human versus murine cytomegalovirus immediate early gene promoters for transgene expression by adenoviral vectors", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, SPENCERS WOOD, GB, (19970701), vol. 78, no. 7, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 1653 - 1661, XP002102028 [A] 1-25 * Abstract, Fig.2, 3 * | [A] - CHAN YU-JIUN ET AL, "Synergistic interactions between overlapping binding sites for the serum response factor and ELK-1 proteins mediate both basal enhancement and phorbol ester responsiveness of primate cytomegalovirus major immediate-early promoters in monocyte and T-lymphocyte cell types", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19961201), vol. 70, no. 12, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 8590 - 8605, XP002331463 [A] 1-25 * Whole doc., in particular Fig 1 * | by applicant | WO9003184 | WO9014837 | US5057540 | US5122458 | WO9611711 | US5559099 | US5723127 | WO9839411 | US5837511 | US5837520 | US5846782 | US5851806 | WO9900510 | US5891690 | US5965541 | WO9955132 | US5981225 | US5994128 | US5994106 | US6020191 | US6040174 | US6083716 | US6113913 | WO0070071 | US6225289 | US6261823 | EP1230354 | US6485958 | EP0853660 | WO03049763 | WO03061708 | WO03078592 | WO03104467 | WO2004001032 | EP1230354 | WO2004004762 | WO2004020971 | WO2004037294 | WO2004055187 | WO2005002620 | WO2005071093 | WO2005080556 | WO2006053871 | WO2006108707 | WO2006120034 | WO2007073513 | WO2007100908 | US7270811 | WO2007104792 | WO2007110409 | US7326555 | EP1601776 | US7407801 | WO2009026183 | US7501129 | WO2009117134 | WO2010085984 | WO2010086189 | WO2010096561 | WO2011045378 | WO2011045381 | WO2013139911 | WO2013139916 | US8932607 | WO2016166088 | - Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc. | - GenBank, Database accession no. EF 153474 | - FRESHNEY, R.I., Culture of animal cells: A manual of basic technique, 4th ed., Wiley-Liss Inc., (20000000), ISBN 0-471-34889-9 | - ABBINK, P.; LEMCKERT, A. A.; EWALD, B. A.; LYNCH, D. M.; DENHOLTZ, M.; SMITS, S.; BAROUCH, D. H., "Comparative seroprevalence and immunogenicity of six rare serotype recombinant adenovirus vaccine vectors from subgroups B and D", J Virol, (20070000), vol. 81, no. 9, pages 4654 - 4663, XP002451979 | - ALTSCHUL, S. F.; GISH, W.; MILLER, W.; MYERS, E. W.; LIPMAN, D. J., "Basic local alignment search tool", J Mol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999, pages 403 - 410, XP002949123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999 | - BARRY, P. A.; ALCENDOR, D. J.; POWER, M. D.; KERR, H.; LUCIW, P. A., "Nucleotide sequence and molecular analysis of the rhesus cytomegalovirus immediate-early gene and the UL121-117 open reading frames", Virology, (19960000), vol. 215, no. 1, pages 61 - 72 | - BELOUSOVA, N.; HARRIS, R.; ZINN, K.; RHODES-SELSER, M. A.; KOTOV, A.; KOTOVA, O.; ALVAREZ, R. D., "Circumventing recombination events encountered with production of a clinical-grade adenoviral vector with a double-expression cassette", Mol Pharmacol, (20060000), vol. 70, no. 5, pages 1488 - 1493 | - CHAN, Y. J.; CHIOU, C. J.; HUANG, Q.; HAYWARD, G. S., "Synergistic interactions between overlapping binding sites for the serum response factor and ELK-1 proteins mediate both basal enhancement and phorbol ester responsiveness of primate cytomegalovirus major immediate-early promoters in monocyte and T-lymphocyte cell types", J Virol, (19960000), vol. 70, no. 12, pages 8590 - 8605, XP002331463 | - CHANG, Y. N.; JEANG, K. T.; CHIOU, C. J.; CHAN, Y. J.; PIZZORNO, M.; HAYWARD, G. S., "Identification of a large bent DNA domain and binding sites for serum response factor adjacent to the NFI repeat cluster and enhancer region in the major IE94 promoter from simian cytomegalovirus", J Virol, (19930000), vol. 67, no. 1, pages 516 - 529 | - FOECKING, M. K.; HOFSTETTER, H., "Powerful and versatile enhancer-promoter unit for mammalian expression vectors", Gene, (19860000), vol. 45, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(86)90137-X, pages 101 - 105, XP023543375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(86)90137-X | - GAO, G. P.; ENGDAHL, R. K.; WILSON, J. M., "A cell line for high-yield production of El-deleted adenovirus vectors without the emergence of replication-competent virus", Hum Gene Ther, (20000000), vol. 77, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1089/10430340050016283, pages 213 - 219, XP000990183 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10430340050016283 | - GIBSON, D. G.; YOUNG, L.; CHUANG, R. Y.; VENTER, J. C.; HUTCHISON, C. A., 3RD; SMITH, H. O., "Enzymatic assembly of DNA molecules up to several hundred kilobases", Nat Methods, (20090000), vol. 6, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.1318, pages 343 - 345, XP055224105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1318 | - GOSSEN, M.; BUJARD, H., "Tight control of gene expression in mammalian cells by tetracycline-responsive promoters", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19920000), vol. 89, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.12.5547, pages 5547 - 5551, XP002202393 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.12.5547 | - GOSSEN, M.; FREUNDLIEB, S.; BENDER, G.; MULLER, G.; HILLEN, W.; BUJARD, H., "Transcriptional activation by tetracyclines in mammalian cells", Science, (19950000), vol. 268, no. 5218, pages 1766 - 1769 | - HANSEN, S. G.; STRELOW, L. I.; FRANCHI, D. C.; ANDERS, D. G.; WONG, S. W., "Complete sequence and genomic analysis of rhesus cytomegalovirus", J Virol, (20030000), vol. 77, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1128/JVI.77.12.6620-6636.2003, pages 6620 - 6636, XP002536847 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.12.6620-6636.2003 | - HAVENGA, M.; VOGELS, R.; ZUIJDGEEST, D.; RADOSEVIC, K.; MUELLER, S.; SIEUWERTS, M.; GOUDSMIT, J., "Novel replication-incompetent adenoviral B-group vectors: high vector stability and yield in PER.C6 cells", J Gen Virol, (20060000), vol. 87, doi:doi:10.1099/vir.0.81956-0, pages 2135 - 2143, XP002496482 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/vir.0.81956-0 | - HEILBRONN, R.; WEGER, S., "Viral vectors for gene transfer: current status of gene therapeutics", Handb Exp Pharmacol, (20100000), vol. 191, pages 143 - 170 | - HOGANSON, D.K.; MA, J.C.; ASATO, L.; ONG, M.; PRINTZ, M.A.; HUYGHE, B.G.; D'ANDREA, M.J., "Development of a Stable Adenoviral Vector Formulation", BioProcessing J., (20020000), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 43 - 48 | - HOLTERMAN, L.; VOGELS, R.; VAN DER VLUGT, R.; SIEUWERTS, M.; GRIMBERGEN, J.; KASPERS, J.; HAVENGA, M., "Novel replication-incompetent vector derived from adenovirus type 11 (Adl 1) for vaccination and gene therapy: low seroprevalence and non-cross-reactivity with Ad5", J Virol, (20040000), vol. 78, no. 23, doi:doi:10.1128/JVI.78.23.13207-13215.2004, pages 13207 - 13215, XP008155615 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.23.13207-13215.2004 | - LEMCKERT, A. A.; GRIMBERGEN, J.; SMITS, S.; HARTKOORN, E.; HOLTERMAN, L.; BERKHOUT, B.; HAVENGA, M. J., "Generation of a novel replication-incompetent adenoviral vector derived from human adenovirus type 49: manufacture on PER.C6 cells, tropism and immunogenicity", J Gen Virol, (20060000), vol. 87, doi:doi:10.1099/VIR.0.82079-0, pages 2891 - 2899, XP002514849 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/VIR.0.82079-0 | - MAIZEL, J. V., JR.; WHITE, D. O.; SCHARFF, M. D., "The polypeptides of adenovirus. I. Evidence for multiple protein components in the virion and a comparison of types 2, 7A, and 12", Virology, (19680000), vol. 36, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0042-6822(68)90121-9, pages 115 - 125, XP023053253 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(68)90121-9 | - MULLICK, A.; XU, Y.; WARREN, R.; KOUTROUMANIS, M.; GUILBAULT, C.; BROUSSAU, S.; MASSIE, B., "The cumate gene-switch: a system for regulated expression in mammalian cells", BMC Biotechnol, (20060000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1186/1472-6750-6-43, page 43, XP021023579 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-6-43 | - OGUN, S. A.; DUMON-SEIGNOVERT, L.; MARCHAND, J. B.; HOLDER, A. A.; HILL, F., "The oligomerization domain of C4-binding protein (C4bp) acts as an adjuvant, and the fusion protein comprised of the 19-kilodalton merozoite surface protein 1 fused with the murine C4bp domain protects mice against malaria", Infect Immun, (20080000), vol. 76, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1128/IAI.01369-07, pages 3817 - 3823, XP002612266 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.01369-07 | - POWELL, S. K.; RIVERA-SOTO, R.; GRAY, S. J., "Viral expression cassette elements to enhance transgene target specificity and expression in gene therapy", Discov Med, (20150000), vol. 19, no. 102, pages 49 - 57, XP055272358 | - ROBBINS, P. D.; GHIVIZZANI, S. C., "Viral vectors for gene therapy", Pharmacol Ther, (19980000), vol. 80, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0163-7258(98)00020-5, pages 35 - 47, XP002927113 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0163-7258(98)00020-5 | - RUBNITZ, J.; SUBRAMANI, S., "The minimum amount of homology required for homologous recombination in mammalian cells", Mol Cell Biol, (19840000), vol. 4, no. 11, pages 2253 - 2258, XP008004789 | - SCHLABACH, M. R.; HU, J. K.; LI, M.; ELLEDGE, S. J., "Synthetic design of strong promoters", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20100000), vol. 107, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0914803107, pages 2538 - 2543, XP055064057 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0914803107 | - SMALE, S. T., "Core promoters: active contributors to combinatorial gene regulation", Genes Dev, (20010000), vol. 15, no. 19, pages 2503 - 2508 | - VOGELS, R.; ZUIJDGEEST, D.; VAN RIJNSOEVER, R.; HARTKOORN, E.; DAMEN, I.; DE BETHUNE, M. P.; HAVENGA, M., "Replication-deficient human adenovirus type 35 vectors for gene transfer and vaccination: efficient human cell infection and bypass of preexisting adenovirus immunity", J Virol, (20030000), vol. 77, no. 15, pages 8263 - 8271 | - WALTHER, W.; STEIN, U., "Viral vectors for gene transfer: a review of their use in the treatment of human diseases", Drugs, (20000000), vol. 60, no. 2, doi:doi:10.2165/00003495-200060020-00002, pages 249 - 271, XP000979501 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-200060020-00002 | - ZAHN, R.; GILLISEN, G.; ROOS, A.; KONING, M.; VAN DER HELM, E.; SPEK, D.; RODRIGUEZ, A., "Ad35 and ad26 vaccine vectors induce potent and cross-reactive antibody and T-cell responses to multiple filovirus species", PLoS One, (20120000), vol. 7, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0044115, page e44115, XP055159321 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0044115 |