EP3573940 - POLYAMINOBORANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Université de Rennes 1 2, rue du Thabor CS 46510 35065 Rennes / FR | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALCARAZ, Gilles 90ter rue de Fougères 35700 Rennes / FR | 02 /
DE ALBUQUERQUE PINHEIRO, Carlos Antonio Placa Dera Gleisa 6 Vielha, Lleida 25530 / FR | 03 /
ROILAND, Claire 55 Bd Louis Volclair 35200 Rennes / FR | [2021/24] |
Former [2019/49] | 01 /
ALCARAZ, Gilles 90ter rue de Fougères 35700 Rennes / FR | ||
02 /
DE ALBUQUERQUE PINHEIRO, Carlos Antonio 28 Avenue du Doyen Roger Houin 35700 Rennes / FR | |||
03 /
ROILAND, Claire 27 Avenue Gros Malhon 35000 Rennes / FR | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18704903.6 | 30.01.2018 | [2019/49] | WO2018EP52312 | Priority number, date | FR20170050723 | 30.01.2017 Original published format: FR 1750723 | [2019/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018138384 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573940 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3573940 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/46, C08G79/00, C08G79/08 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
C08G79/00 (EP);
C08G79/08 (EP,US);
C04B35/46 (EP);
C04B35/583 (US);
Y02E60/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYAMINOBORANE | [2019/49] | English: | POLYAMINOBORANES | [2019/49] | French: | POLYAMINOBORANES | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 23.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2018 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | RS | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | IE | 30.01.2022 | LU | 30.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
MK | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB881820 (UNITED STATES BORAX CHEM) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 53; example -; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US3047623 (MILKS JOHN E) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 65; example -; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US5015607 (ARDAUD PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 12 - column 7, line 27; example -; claims 1-20 *; | [X]US5071935 (ARDAUD PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 8 - column 8, line 46; example -; claims 1-44 *; | [X] - ANTON B. BURG ET AL, "The N-Methyl Derivatives of B 2 H 7 N", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19491001), vol. 71, no. 10, doi:10.1021/ja01178a056, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3451 - 3455, XP055399143 [X] 1-14 * page 3451 - page 6013 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01178a056 | by applicant | - A STAUBITZ et al., "Iridium-Catalyzed Dehydrocoupling of Primary Amine-Borane Adducts: A Route to High Molecular Weight Polyaminoboranes, Boron-Nitrogen Analogues of Polyolefins", Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20080000), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1002/anie.200801197, pages 6212 - 6215, XP055399139 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200801197 | - A STAUBITZ et al., "Catalytic Dehydrocoupling/Dehydrogenation of N-Methylamine-Borane and Ammonia-Borane: Synthesis and Characterization of High Molecular Weight Polyaminoboranes", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20100000), vol. 132, doi:doi:10.1021/ja104607y, pages 13332 - 13345, XP055143843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja104607y | - B. L. DIETRICH et al., "Iridium-Catalyzed Dehydrogenation of Substituted Amine Boranes: Kinetics, Thermodynamics, and Implications for Hydrogen Storage", Inorganic Chemistry, (20080000), vol. 47, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1021/ic801161g, pages 8583 - 8585, XP055399141 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic801161g | - N. E. SUBBS et al., "Amine-borane dehydrogenation chemistry: Metal-free hydrogen transfer, new catalysts and mechanisms, and the synthesis of polyaminoboranes", Journal of Organometallic Chemistry, (20130000), vol. 730, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jorganchem.2012.10.010, pages 84 - 89, XP028583509 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jorganchem.2012.10.010 |