EP3580029 - METHOD AND EXTRUSION INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING A BLANK FROM A CERAMIC MASS AND BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lapp Insulator GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 5 95632 Wunsiedel / DE | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGER, Werner Cheddletonring 23 95666 Mitterteich / DE | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18704959.8 | 08.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018EP53222 | Priority number, date | DE201710202043 | 09.02.2017 Original published format: DE102017202043 | [2019/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018146224 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580029 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B28B3/20, B28B11/00 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
B28B3/20 (EP);
B28B11/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EXTRUSIONSANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HUBELS AUS EINER KERAMISCHEN MASSE SOWIE HUBEL | [2019/51] | English: | METHOD AND EXTRUSION INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING A BLANK FROM A CERAMIC MASS AND BLANK | [2019/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION D'EXTRUSION POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN CYLINDRE DE MASSE À PARTIR D'UNE MASSE CÉRAMIQUE, AINSI QUE CYLINDRE DE MASSE | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 08.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 25.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2789334 (WEBB CECIL E) [X] 1,3,5,6,13 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 60; figures 3-4 * [A] 4,8-11 [I] 2,7; | [A]JP2003191216 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [X]DE102010002248 (BHS TABLETOP AG [DE]) [X] 14,15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * | by applicant | DE1258775 | - Technologie der Keramik, VEB Verlag, vol. 2, pages 165 - 166 |