EP3577793 - UPLINK BEAM MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDAC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Kyle Jung-Lin 9 Country Woods Drive Saint James, NY 11780 / US | 02 /
XI, Fengjun 10838 Aderman Avenue Apartment 144 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 03 /
YE, Chunxuan 17247 4S Ranch Parkway San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Stortorget 17 252 20 Helsingborg / SE | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18705538.9 | 02.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US16621 | Priority number, date | US201762454568P | 03.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454568 P | US201762501021P | 03.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762501021 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018144844 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3577793 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08, H04B7/06, H04W74/08 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0002 (US);
H01L21/2254 (US);
H01L21/28238 (US);
H01L21/30617 (US);
H04B7/0408 (KR,US);
H04B7/06966 (EP);
H04L25/0226 (US);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W74/0833 (KR,US);
H01L21/76224 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | UPLINK-STRAHLMANAGEMENT | [2019/50] | English: | UPLINK BEAM MANAGEMENT | [2019/50] | French: | GESTION DE FAISCEAU DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 01.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016087706 (GUEY JIANN-CHING [TW], et al); |