EP3580547 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VoxelGrid GmbH Beethovenplatz 4 80336 München / DE | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WETZEL, Karl Christian Mozartstrasse 23 80336 München / DE | 02 /
ANDREOU, Charoula Friedrichshafenerstrasse 7 81243 München / DE | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18706670.9 | 09.02.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018EP53352 | Priority number, date | EP20170000215 | 10.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17000215 | [2019/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018146279 | Date: | 16.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3580547 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3580547 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G06K9/00, G01S17/42, G01N21/31, G06T17/05, G06T7/20, G06T1/00, G01S17/89, G01N21/94, G01N21/35, G06T7/90 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G01N21/35 (EP,US);
B64U10/13 (EP,US);
B64U2101/70 (US);
G01C15/002 (EP,US);
G01C21/1656 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (EP);
G01N21/94 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S19/01 (US);
G05D1/0246 (US);
G06T17/05 (US);
G06T7/62 (US);
G06T7/90 (EP);
G06V20/176 (US);
B64U2101/30 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP);
G06T2207/30184 (EP);
G06T2210/56 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | G01N21/31, G01N21/35, G01N21/94, G01S17/89, G06T1/00, G06T7/20, G06T17/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE VON OBJEKTEN | [2019/51] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING OBJECTS | [2019/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'OBJETS | [2019/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 10.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2022 | 13.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2013202197 (REELER EDMUND COCHRANE [CA], et al); | Examination | WO2010009498 |