EP3585836 - POLYPHASIC POLYMER SUSPENSION AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/01] | MULTIPHASE POLYMER SUSPENSION AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2021/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPCM SA Zone d'Activité Commerciale de Milieux 42160 Andrézieux-Bouthéon / FR | [2022/14] |
Former [2020/01] | For all designated states S.P.C.M. SA ZAC de Milieux 42160 Andrézieux Bouthéon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAVERO, Cédrick ZAC de Milieux 42160 Andrézieux Bouthéon / FR | 02 /
OMONT, Alexandre ZAC de Milieux 42160 Andrézieux Bouthéon / FR | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18706827.5 | 15.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018FR50361 | Priority number, date | FR20170051501 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: FR 1751501 | [2020/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018154219 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3585836 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3585836 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/14, C08L33/26 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
C08L33/14 (EP);
C09K8/588 (US);
C02F1/5245 (US);
C02F1/5272 (US);
C02F1/56 (US);
C08L33/02 (US);
C08L33/26 (EP,US);
E21B43/16 (US);
C02F2001/007 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L33/14, C08L1/284, C08K3/16 (EP);
C08L33/26, C08L1/284, C08K3/16 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPHASIGE POLYMERSUSPENSION UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2021/47] | English: | POLYPHASIC POLYMER SUSPENSION AND ITS USE | [2021/47] | French: | SUSPENSION POLYPHASIQUE DE POLYMÈRE ET SON UTILISATION | [2020/01] |
Former [2020/01] | MEHRPHASIGE POLYMERSUSPENSION UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2020/01] | MULTIPHASE POLYMER SUSPENSION AND USE THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 09.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/44] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009047480 (BP EXPLORATION OPERATING [GB], et al) [Y] 1-18 * example 1 *; | [Y]WO2011100665 (RHODIA OPERATIONS [FR], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0746] , [ 739 546]; table 11 *; | [A]US2016298023 (CADIX ARNAUD [FR], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0024] , [ 0068]; example 1 * | by applicant | US2005239957 | WO2005100423 | WO2009047480 | WO2010133258 | WO2011100665 | WO2013015003 | WO2013150203 | WO2014075964 | WO2016051777 | WO2016069937 | - "Oil & gas science and technology", revue IFP, (20080000), vol. 63, no. l, pages 9 - 19 |