EP3585609 - CONTAINER COVERED WITH A FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Packconnect B.V. Zutphenseweg 51 7418 AH Deventer / NL | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN REIJ, Charles Jacques Madeleine Oude Larenseweg 19 7214 PC Epse / NL | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | van Straaten, Joop Octrooibureau Van Straaten B.V. Graaf Ottostraat 6 7001 HN Doetinchem / NL | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18706987.7 | 16.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018EP53949 | Priority number, date | BE20170005114 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: BE 201705114 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018153795 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3585609 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/28, B32B27/36, B32B1/02, B32B3/26 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/285 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B3/266 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2274/00 (EP);
B32B2307/30 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (EP);
B32B2307/518 (EP);
B32B2307/726 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
B32B2307/738 (EP);
B32B2439/40 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT EINEM FILM | [2021/43] | English: | CONTAINER COVERED WITH A FILM | [2020/01] | French: | CONTENANT RECOUVERT D'UN FILM | [2021/43] |
Former [2020/01] | MIT EINEM FILM BESCHICHTETER BEHÄLTER | ||
Former [2020/01] | RÉCIPIENT RECOUVERT D'UN FILM | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 14.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 10.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2020 | 28.02.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS51131582 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [AD]US5888599 (BRADT RICHARD W [US]); | [AD]US2005266056 (LEE I-HWA [US], et al); | [AD]US2013224411 (MONTCRIEFF JON IAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US5888599 | US2005079372 | US2005266056 | WO2006075141 | DE202010008675U | US2013022441 | US2013224411 |