EP3573663 - A COMPOSITION COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE GNRH ANTAGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/49] | A composition comprising at least one GNRH antagonist | ||
[2020/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Antev Limited 3rd Floor, 106 New Bond Street London W1S 1DN / GB | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states Antev Limited 22 South Molton Street London W1K 5RB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Finn 18 Forest Road Bonchester Bridge Hawick TD9 8JS / GB | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 18707414.1 | 30.01.2018 | [2019/49] | WO2018IB50559 | Priority number, date | US201762452096P | 30.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762452096 P | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018138703 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3573663 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3573663 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K38/09, A61P35/00 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
A61K38/09 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (KR,US);
A61K9/10 (KR);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP,KR);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/26 (EP,KR);
A61P5/30 (EP,KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/09, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K45/06, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | 30.08.2019 | ME | 30.08.2019 | Validation states | MA | 30.08.2019 | MD | 30.08.2019 | TN | 30.08.2019 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM GNRH-ANTAGONISTEN | [2019/49] | English: | A COMPOSITION COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE GNRH ANTAGONIST | [2020/27] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN ANTAGONISTE DE LA GNRH | [2019/49] |
Former [2019/49] | A composition comprising at least one GNRH antagonist | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 30.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20165541.2 / EP3701965 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2018 | AL | 07.04.2021 | AT | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 30.01.2018 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008071984 (ARDANA BIOSCIENCE LTD [GB], et al); | [XY]WO2013104745 (FERRING BV [NL]); | by applicant | WO0154662 | WO03022243 |