EP3577790 - MULTI-SITE MIMO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM WITH HYBRID BEAMFORMING IN L1-SPLIT ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altiostar Networks, Inc. 200 Ames Pond Drive Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US | [2019/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jung, Ah 200 Ames Pond Drive Tewksbury MA 01876 / US | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/50] | Application number, filing date | 18707460.4 | 06.02.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018US16988 | Priority number, date | US201762455315P | 06.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762455315 P | [2019/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018145062 | Date: | 09.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3577790 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04W88/08 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H04B7/06 (EP,US);
H04B7/08 (RU);
H04B7/0413 (KR);
H04B7/0617 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0456 (KR,US);
H04B7/0682 (KR);
H04B7/0697 (KR);
H04J3/1682 (KR,US);
H04L69/04 (KR,US);
H04W88/085 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Title | German: | MULTISTANDORT-MIMO-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT HYBRIDER STRAHLFORMUNG IN EINER L1-GETEILTEN ARCHITEKTUR | [2019/50] | English: | MULTI-SITE MIMO COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM WITH HYBRID BEAMFORMING IN L1-SPLIT ARCHITECTURE | [2019/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MIMO MULTI-SITE À FORMATION DE FAISCEAU HYBRIDE DANS UNE ARCHITECTURE DIVISÉE DE L1 | [2019/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 02.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 15.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/06] | Divisional application(s) | EP21208866.0 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013084058 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]); | [XY]WO2014076004 (TELEFONICA SA [ES]); | [Y]WO2015115776 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]WO2016115545 (LIANG PING [US]) |