EP3759802 - ELECTRIC MOTOR VEHICLE AUXILIARY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg Pump Technology GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Str. 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Christian Zum Kuckeshof 47 47239 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
GROSS, Peter Eduard-Daelen-Str. 20 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | terpatent PartGmbB Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | terpatent Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Daubert Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18708645.9 | 28.02.2018 | [2021/01] | WO2018EP54902 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019166080 | Date: | 06.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3759802 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/33, H02K11/40, H02K9/19, H02K9/22 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H02K11/40 (EP,US);
B60K25/00 (US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K5/203 (US);
H02K5/225 (US);
H02K9/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES KFZ-NEBENAGGREGAT | [2021/01] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR VEHICLE AUXILIARY UNIT | [2021/01] | French: | GROUPE AUXILIAIRE ÉLECTRIQUE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 02.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2445775 (JOHNSON ELECTRIC SA [CH]) [A] 1-9* pages 5-7; figures 1-8 *; | [A]CN101791974 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * figures 5-10 *; | [Y]EP2500576 (GRUNDFOS MANAGEMENT AS [DK]) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 37] - [0044] *; | [Y]EP2725691 (PIERBURG PUMP TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0021] - [0028]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2016248292 (TAKARAI KENYA [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0071] - [0081]; figures 1,2,3,4,8 * | by applicant | DE19728291 | US5982253 | EP2053726 | EP2187718 | EP2476914 |