EP3589741 - MICROPARTICLE FOR CULTIVATING AND TESTING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomillenia SAS 102 avenue Gaston Roussel Building Lavoisier 93230 Romainville / FR | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOEFFERT, Dirk Heideweg 23 42781 Haan / DE | 02 /
DAJKOVIC, Aleksander c/o BIOCITECH 102 avenue Gaston Roussel Building Lavoisier 93230 Romainville / FR | 03 /
DUBOYS, Thomas c/o BIOCITECH 102 avenue Gaston Roussel Building Lavoisier 93230 Romainville / FR | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstraße 29 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstrasse 29 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 18708684.8 | 02.03.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018EP55220 | Priority number, date | EP20170159201 | 03.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17159201 | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018158450 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3589741 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/02, C12N5/00, G01N33/543 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/02 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
C12N5/0679 (EP,US);
C12N2502/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Title | German: | MIKROPARTIKEL ZUR KULTIVIERUNG UND PRÜFUNG VON ZELLEN | [2020/02] | English: | MICROPARTICLE FOR CULTIVATING AND TESTING CELLS | [2020/02] | French: | MICROPARTICULE DESTINÉE À CULTIVER ET TESTER DES CELLULES | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 30.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/28] | 14.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02060276 (VALIO LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2008116319 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [X] 1,18,19 * whole document, i particular claims 1-14; fig. 3) *; | [XY]WO2009015390 (UNIV CHICAGO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-19 * whole document, in particular 25, 31, 36, 40, 61-76, 82, 86, 92-94, 101, 102, 108-110, 121-123, 147, 195-199; fig. 7; examples * [Y] 2; | [A]WO2011075848 (MICROPHARMA LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012003285 (BIBETTE JEROME [FR], et al) [X] 1,18,19 * whole document, in particular par. 9, 35, 40-43, 45, 108, 147-150; fig. 2 *; | [XY]US2013203161 (MARZORATI MASSIMO [BE], et al) [X] 1,2,18,19 * whole document, in particularpar. 42, 46, 60, 78, 106-121, 151; fig. 4; claims 1, 11-14 * [Y] 2; | [A]US2013230859 (WACKLIN PIRJO [FI], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016333310 (GIARRATANA MARIA CATALINA [FR], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X] - STRAND B L ET AL, "ALGINATE-POLYLYSINE-ALGINATE MICROCAPSULES: EFFECT OF SIZE REDUCTION ON CAPSULE PROPERTIES", JOURNAL OF MICROENCAPSULATION, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS, BASINGSTOKE, GB, (20020901), vol. 19, no. 5, doi:10.1080/02652040210144243, ISSN 0265-2048, pages 615 - 630, XP008044928 [X] 1,18,19 * whole document, in particular p. 615, bridging par. - p. 616, par. 3; p. 619, par. 2; p. 625, par. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02652040210144243 | [X] - BERIT L STRAND ET AL, "Alginate as immobilization matrix for cells", MINERVA BIOTECNOLOGICA, New York, (20001201), vol. 12, doi:10.1093/0195138929.001.0001, ISBN 978-0-19-513892-4, pages 223 - 233, XP055469380 [X] 1,18,19 * whole document, in particular p. 223, col. 2 - p. 234, col. 1 bridging par.; p. 229, col. 2 - p. 230, col. 1, par. 3; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/0195138929.001.0001 | by applicant | WO2010063937 | - STRAND, J. Microencapsul., (20020000), vol. 19, pages 615 - 630 |