EP3589340 - DOSE DETECTION AND DRUG IDENTIFICATION FOR A MEDICATION DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eli Lilly and Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYERLY, Roy Howard c/o ELI LILLY AND COMPANY P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 02 /
MASSARI, Rossano Claudio c/o ELI LILLY AND COMPANY P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 03 /
MURPHY, Patrick Kevin c/o ELI LILLY AND COMPANY P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 04 /
PACCIORETTI, Davide c/o ELI LILLY AND COMPANY P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 05 /
PERKINS, Russell Wayne c/o ELI LILLY AND COMPANY P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 06 /
PSZENNY, Sean Matthew c/o ELI LILLY AND COMPANY P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 07 /
REGELE, Oliver Brian c/o ELI LILLY AND COMPANY P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18708870.3 | 22.02.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018US19156 | Priority number, date | US201762464662P | 28.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762464662 P | US201762539106P | 31.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762539106 P | US201762552556P | 31.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762552556 P | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018160425 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3589340 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
A61M5/31568 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M5/31535 (CN);
A61M5/20 (CN);
A61M5/3155 (CN);
A61M5/31551 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M2005/3126 (CN,IL,US);
A61M2205/3306 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,CN,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | 20.09.2019 | ME | 20.09.2019 | Validation states | MA | 20.09.2019 | MD | 20.09.2019 | Title | German: | DOSISERKENNUNG UND MEDIKAMENTENIDENTIFIKATION FÜR EINE MEDIKAMENTENABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/02] | English: | DOSE DETECTION AND DRUG IDENTIFICATION FOR A MEDICATION DELIVERY DEVICE | [2020/02] | French: | DÉTECTION DE DOSE ET IDENTIFICATION DE MÉDICAMENT POUR DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 20.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP3042676 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [A]US2016331906 (HARMS MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [XI]EP3103492 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [I]US2016378951 (GOFMAN IGOR Y [US], et al) | by applicant | US7291132 | US8734394 |