EP3589328 - MAYTANSINOID DERIVATIVES WITH SELF-IMMOLATIVE PEPTIDE LINKERS AND CONJUGATES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunogen, Inc. 830 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIDDISON, Wayne, C. 7 Holden Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | McNab, Donald C. Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 18710275.1 | 27.02.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018US19874 | Priority number, date | US201762465118P | 28.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762465118 P | US201762480209P | 31.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762480209 P | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018160539 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3589328 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/65, A61K47/68, A61P35/00 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
A61K31/5365 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6889 (IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/65 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/6803 (IL);
A61K47/68033 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/6809 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6831 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (CN,IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | 06.09.2019 | ME | 06.09.2019 | Validation states | MA | 06.09.2019 | MD | 06.09.2019 | TN | 06.09.2019 | Title | German: | MAYTANSINOIDDERIVATE MIT SELBSTIMMOLATIVEN PEPTIDLINKERN UND KONJUGATEN DAVON | [2020/02] | English: | MAYTANSINOID DERIVATIVES WITH SELF-IMMOLATIVE PEPTIDE LINKERS AND CONJUGATES THEREOF | [2020/02] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE MAYTANSINOÏDES COMPRENANT DES LIEURS PEPTIDIQUES AUTO-IMMOLABLES ET CONJUGUÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 06.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2014176284 (AVELAS BIOSCIENCES INC [US]); | [X]WO2015038426 (ASANA BIOSCIENCES LLC [US]); | [X]WO2016036794 (IMMUNOGEN INC [US]) | by applicant | US2010129 | WO9201047 | US5208020 | US5475092 | US5639641 | WO9906587 | US5885793 | US5969108 | WO0220565 | US6441163 | US6716821 | WO2004043344 | US2004132028 | WO2004103272 | WO2005009369 | US6913748 | US2005169933 | WO2006083275 | US7101675 | WO2007024222 | US2007082365 | WO2007062466 | US7276497 | US7276499 | US2007238667 | WO2007147213 | US2008050310 | US7342110 | US7368565 | US2008139791 | US7388026 | US2008152586 | US2008171040 | US7414073 | US2008305044 | US2009082274 | US7557189 | US2009274713 | WO2009134976 | US2010129314 | US2010216708 | US2010255056 | US7834155 | US2011118146 | WO2011106528 | US2011224100 | WO2011112978 | US2011274623 | US8119787 | WO2012058592 | WO2012058588 | US2012171115 | US8337855 | US8435528 | US8557966 | US8709432 | US2014163201 | US8765917 | US9133275 | WO2017004026 | US9598490 | US9657100 | US9670278 | US9670279 | US9670280 |