EP3586152 - TESTING HEAD WITH IMPROVED FREQUENCY PROPERTY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technoprobe S.p.A Via Cavalieri di Vittorio Veneto, 2 23870 Cernusco Lombardone (Lecco) / IT | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRIPPA, Roberto c/o TECHNOPROBE S.p.A. Via Cavalieri di Vittorio Veneto 2 23870 Cernusco Lombardone (Lecco) / IT | 02 /
MAGGIONI, Flavio c/o TECHNOPROBE S.p.A. Via Cavalieri di Vittorio Veneto 2 23870 Cernusco Lombardone (Lecco) / IT | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | Ferrari, Barbara Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 18710776.8 | 22.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018EP54329 | Priority number, date | IT20170021397 | 24.02.2017 Original published format: IT201700021397 | [2020/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018153949 | Date: | 30.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586152 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/073 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G01R1/07357 (EP,KR);
G01R1/07371 (EP,KR,US);
G01R1/06755 (KR);
G01R1/06761 (US);
G01R31/2886 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | PRÜFKOPF MIT VERBESSERTEN FREQUENZEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2020/01] | English: | TESTING HEAD WITH IMPROVED FREQUENCY PROPERTY | [2020/01] | French: | TÊTE D'ESSAI À PROPRIÉTÉ DE FRÉQUENCE AMÉLIORÉE | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 18.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 11.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012242360 (HUANG KENG-YI [TW], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2014062519 (DING HANYI [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figure 6 *; | [XI]JP2014112046 (MICRONICS JAPAN CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-14; | [A]US2014197860 (HSU HSIEN-TA [TW], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0037]; figures 2-6 *; | [A]KR101421051B (WILL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |