EP3764812 - PRODUCTION OF SPICE PLANT PART PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise AG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILMER, Jens-Michael Heuweg 3 37603 Holzminden / DE | 02 /
KINDEL, Alexander Möring-Str. 20 37671 Höxter / DE | 03 /
KINDEL, Günter Grabenstr. 1 37671 Höxter / DE | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 18712135.5 | 13.03.2018 | [2021/03] | WO2018EP56286 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019174722 | Date: | 19.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764812 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23L27/10, A23L27/14 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A23L27/10 (EP);
A23L27/14 (EP,US);
A23L27/11 (EP,US);
A23L27/115 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON GEWÜRZPFLANZENTEIL-PARTIKELN | [2021/03] | English: | PRODUCTION OF SPICE PLANT PART PARTICLES | [2021/03] | French: | FABRICATION DE PARTICULES DE PARTIES DE PLANTES AROMATIQUES | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 14.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPH08208496 [ ]; | [X]DE3137230 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE], et al) [X] 17-23 * the whole document *; | [XI]US4956192 (ANSALDI GWENAELE [FR], et al) [X] 17-21 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 65; examples 1-3; claims 1-3 * [I] 8,15,22,23; | [XYI]JPH08208496 (NAGASHIMA AKIHIRO) [X] 1-4,12,22,23 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0025]; claim 3 * [Y] 9-11 [I] 5-7; | [XY]EP2509433 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061]; claims 1,2,4,5 * [Y] 9-11; | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 42, Database accession no. 1996-421904, & JPH08208496 A 19960813 (NAGASHIMA A) [ ] * abstract * | [X] - RANADIVE A S, "Vanillin and related flavor compounds in vanilla extracts made from beans of various global origins", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, BOOKS AND JOURNALS DIVISION, US, (19920101), vol. 40, doi:10.1021/JF00022A039, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1922 - 1924, XP002218298 [X] 14-17 * page 1922, column left, line 40 - column right, line 5 * * page 1922, column right, line 37 - line 45; tables I,II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00022a039 | [A] - E. ODOUX ET AL, "The relation between glucovanillin, [beta]-d-glucosidase activity and cellular compartmentation during the senescence, freezing and traditional curing of vanilla beans", ANNALS OF APPLIED BIOLOGY., GB, (20060801), vol. 149, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1744-7348.2006.00071.x, ISSN 0003-4746, pages 43 - 52, XP055481835 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1744-7348.2006.00071.x | by applicant | US2835591 | FR2634979 | EP0555466 | WO2004091316 | EP1613178 | MX2007007866 | EP2075320 | EP2375918 | CN103981029 | - I. L. GATFIELD; J.-M. HILMER; B. WEBER; F. HAMMERSCHMIDT; I. REIß; G. POUTOT; H.-J. BERTRAM; D. MEIER, "Chemical and biochemical changes occurring during the traditional madagascan vanilla curing process", Perfumer & Flavorist, (20070000), vol. 32, pages 20 - 28 | WO2017EP78735 |