EP3662270 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANALYSING AND CONTROLLING A CRYSTALLISATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bjarne Christian Nielsen Holding ApS Egegaardsvej 2 6541 Bevtoft / DK | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Bjarne, Christian Egegårdsvej 2 6541 Bevtoft / DK | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2024/17] |
Former [2020/24] | Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 18712212.2 | 21.03.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018EP57171 | Priority number, date | DK2017PA70201 | 21.03.2017 Original published format: DK PA201770201 | EP20170164553 | 03.04.2017 Original published format: EP 17164553 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018172412 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3662270 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3662270 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/84, B01D1/00, B01D9/00, C13B30/02, G01N21/51, G01N21/53, G01N21/55 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
G01N21/84 (EP);
B01D1/0082 (EP);
B01D9/0036 (EP);
C13B30/02 (EP);
G01N21/51 (EP);
G01N21/532 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALYSE UND STEUERUNG EINES KRISTALLISIERUNGSVERFAHRENS | [2020/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANALYSING AND CONTROLLING A CRYSTALLISATION PROCESS | [2020/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ANALYSER ET COMMANDER UN PROCESSUS DE CRISTALLISATION | [2023/30] |
Former [2020/24] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ANALYSE ET DE COMMANDE D'UN PROCESSUS DE CRISTALLISATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/24] | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/24] | 29.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 29.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 1205A dated 05.12.2019) | Bjarne Christian Nielsen Holding ApS Egegaardsvej 2 6541 Bevtoft / DK | [2020/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 29.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 29.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2020 | Decision despatched | 29.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 29.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4056364 (DMITROVSKY MORRIS, et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 4, line 19 - line 36; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]US5124265 (RANDOLPH ALAN D [US]) [X] 12-15 * sentence 37, paragraph 5 - sentence 35, paragraph 6; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]JP2005087087 (TSUKISHIMA KIKAI CO) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] *; | [Y]DE102004047417 (GEBAUER GERD [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102006030734 (GEBAUER GERD [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1; claims 1, 5 *; | [X]CN103335981 (GUANGZHOU SUGARCANE INDUSTRY RES INST) [X] 12 * abstract *; | [A]US2013265584 (BABIC DUBRAVKO IVAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009]; figures 1A, 2; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2016198866 (TROLEX LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XY] - TADAYYON ET AL., "Determination of Particle Size Distribution by Par-Tec 100: Modeling and Experimental Results", PART. PART. SYST. CHARACT., (199806), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1521-4117(199817)15:3<127::AID-PPSC127>3.0.CO;2-B, ISSN 0934-0866, pages 127 - 135, XP002778198 [X] 12-15 * page 127, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 128, column 1, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4117(199817)15:3<127::AID-PPSC127>3.0.CO;2-B | [Y] - Philip E. Plantz, PhD, "Blue Laser Technology Applied to the Microtrac Unified Scatter Technique for Full-Range Particle Size Measurement", SL-AN, vol. 25, (20071207), URL: http://docplayer.net/20943698-Blue-laser-technology-applied-to-the-microtrac-unified-scatter-technique-for-full-range-particle-size-measurement.html, (20180213), XP002778199 [Y] 1-11 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 3, 4b * | [X] - Plantz, Philip E., "Particle size measurements from 0.1 to 1000 micro-meter, based on light scattering and diffraction", Plantz, Philip E., Barth, Howard G., Chemical Analysis: Modern methods of particle size analysis, New York, John Wiley & Sons, (1984), vol. 73, pages 173 - 209, ISBN 0-471-87571-6, XP002778522 [X] 1-6,12-15 * page 173, paragraph 1 - page 179, paragraph 2 * * page 191, paragraph 4 - page 200, paragraph 2; figure 15 * |