EP3596369 - VALVE WITH INTEGRAL BALANCING PASSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher Controls International LLC 205 South Center St. Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GABRIEL, Thomas, N. 2006 S. 4th Ave. Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18712323.7 | 02.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US20563 | Priority number, date | US201715460945 | 16.03.2017 Original published format: US201715460945 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169698 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596369 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3596369 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K39/02, F16K47/08, F16K1/12, F16K27/02, F16K27/08 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
F16K1/12 (EP,RU,US);
F16K1/00 (CN);
F16K1/443 (US);
F16K1/32 (CN);
F16K1/36 (CN);
F16K1/46 (CN);
F16K27/02 (EP,US);
F16K27/08 (EP,US);
F16K39/022 (EP,RU,US);
F16K47/08 (EP,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL MIT INTEGRIERTEM AUSGLEICHSGANG | [2020/04] | English: | VALVE WITH INTEGRAL BALANCING PASSAGE | [2020/04] | French: | SOUPAPE À PASSAGE D'ÉQUILIBRAGE INTÉGRÉ | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 04.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | AT | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | ES | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | IT | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MC | 09.11.2022 | NL | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IE | 02.03.2023 | LU | 02.03.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/12] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IE | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IE | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IE | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
LU | 02.03.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
NL | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR493200 (THE BRITISH WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC & MANUFACTURING [GB]) [A] 6-8,15-17* figure - *; | [XI]DE29816896U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,8,10,11,15,17 * figures 1, 2 * [I] 3-5,7,9,12-14,16,18; | [XI]CN106051171 (NO 725 RES INST CHINA CSIC) [X] 1,2,6,8,10,11,15,17 * figure 1 * [I] 3-5,7,9,12-14,16,18 | Examination | US2016116072 |