EP3601080 - CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Madel S.p.A. Via E. Torricelli 3 48033 Cotignola (Ravenna) / IT | [2022/18] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Madel S.p.A. Via E. Torricelli 3 48010 Cotignola (Ravenna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEBASTIANI, Giacomo Viale Oriani 40 48022 Lugo (Ravenna) / IT | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Meroni, Francesca Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | Branca, Emanuela Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2020/06] | Puggioli, Tommaso Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 18712675.0 | 14.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018IB51687 | Priority number, date | IT20170031163 | 21.03.2017 Original published format: IT201700031163 | [2020/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018172885 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3601080 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3601080 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D23/10 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
B65D23/102 (EP,US);
B65D1/0223 (EP,US);
B65D2501/0081 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER | [2020/06] | English: | CONTAINER | [2020/06] | French: | RÉCIPIENT | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 11.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 18.01.2023 | EE | 18.01.2023 | FI | 18.01.2023 | LT | 18.01.2023 | LV | 18.01.2023 | MC | 18.01.2023 | NL | 18.01.2023 | PL | 18.01.2023 | RO | 18.01.2023 | SE | 18.01.2023 | SM | 18.01.2023 | IE | 14.03.2023 | LU | 14.03.2023 | NO | 18.04.2023 | IS | 18.05.2023 | PT | 18.05.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2024/02] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.03.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
RO | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
EE | 18.01.2023 | ||
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
MC | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 18.01.2023 | |
FI | 18.01.2023 | ||
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
SM | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
IS | 18.05.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PL | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 18.01.2023 | |
LT | 18.01.2023 | ||
LV | 18.01.2023 | ||
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
SE | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
NO | 18.04.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
PT | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 18.01.2023 | |
NL | 18.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 18.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1872771 (LAMAR LITTLE ERNEST) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4327861 (THOMPSON KENNETH P) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9836976 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,10 * abstract * [A] 4,5,7,9,11; | [XA]US6029837 (SLAT WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,11,12 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 39; figures 1, 3-5 * [A] 4,8,10; | [XA]WO2005075308 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12 * page 1, line 2, paragraph 3 - page 2 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1-6 * [A] 10; | [A]EP1852357 (AMCOR LTD [AU]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2008173653 (HAINAUT LAURENT [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-3 * [A] 4-9,11; | [A]WO2009141389 (ELOPAK SYSTEMS [CH], et al) [A] 1-4,8-10 * the whole document * |