EP3609966 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN AQUEOUS LATEX COMPRISING PARTICLES OF A FLUOROPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Viale Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASSI, Mattia Via A. Verga 15 20144 Milano / IT | 02 /
MARRANI, Alessio 2 Vicolo fossato 23900 Lecco / IT | 03 /
KAPELYUSHKO, Valeriy 63 Corso Giuseppe Romita 15121 Alessandria / IT | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Benvenuti, Federica SyensQo S.A. Intellectual Assets Management 98, rue de la Fusée 1130 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Benvenuti, Federica Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 18714796.2 | 09.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018EP59001 | Priority number, date | EP20170165867 | 11.04.2017 Original published format: EP 17165867 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018189092 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609966 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09D127/18, C08F214/26 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
C09D127/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F214/26 (CN,KR,US);
C08F214/262 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F114/26 (US);
C08F14/26 (KR);
C08F2/26 (CN);
C08F2/30 (KR,US);
C08F214/22 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J3/05 (US);
C08L27/18 (US);
C09D5/02 (CN);
C09D5/022 (CN);
F16L11/04 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (EP);
C08F214/222 (CN,US);
C08F216/1408 (CN);
C08F2800/10 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F14/26, C08F2/30 (EP);
C08F214/262, C08F214/22, C08F216/1408 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄSSRIGEN LATEX MIT FLUORPOLYMERTEILCHEN | [2020/08] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN AQUEOUS LATEX COMPRISING PARTICLES OF A FLUOROPOLYMER | [2020/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN LATEX AQUEUX COMPRENANT DES PARTICULES D'UN FLUOROPOLYMÈRE | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 11.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | 05.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2010003929 (SOLVAY SOLEXIS SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1,4 * * example 6 * * paragraph [0060] *; | [Y]WO2011073344 (SOLVAY SOLEXIS SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-5 ** paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071] *; | [Y]JP2017020013 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0104]; example 6 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073] * | by applicant | US4990283 | US5498680 | US6103843 | US8997797 | WO2016099913 | JP2017057379 |