EP3448768 - CRATE WITH FOLDABLE SIDE WALLS AND LOCKING MECHANISM IN THE EDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/10] | CRATE HAVING FOLDABLE SIDE WALLS AND A LOCKING MECHANISM IN THE PERIPHERY | ||
[2019/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFCO Systems GmbH Zugspitzstrasse 7 82049 Pullach / DE | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLERER, Richard Mondstrasse 1 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Pfitzner, Hannes, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2019/10] | Application number, filing date | 18714971.1 | 27.03.2018 | [2019/10] | WO2018EP00123 | Priority number, date | EP20170163354 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17163354 | [2019/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018177591 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3448768 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3448768 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D6/18 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
B65D11/1833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KISTE MIT FALTBAREN SEITENWÄNDEN UND VERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS IM RAND | [2019/10] | English: | CRATE WITH FOLDABLE SIDE WALLS AND LOCKING MECHANISM IN THE EDGE | [2019/51] | French: | BOÎTE AYANT DES PAROIS LATÉRALES PLIABLES ET UN MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE SUR LE BORD | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/10] | CRATE HAVING FOLDABLE SIDE WALLS AND A LOCKING MECHANISM IN THE PERIPHERY | ||
Former [2019/10] | CAISSE DOTÉE DE PAROIS LATÉRALES PLIABLES ET MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE PRÉSENT DANS LE BORD | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 28.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.11.2020 | CY | 04.11.2020 | EE | 04.11.2020 | FI | 04.11.2020 | HR | 04.11.2020 | LT | 04.11.2020 | LV | 04.11.2020 | MC | 04.11.2020 | MK | 04.11.2020 | MT | 04.11.2020 | RS | 04.11.2020 | SI | 04.11.2020 | SM | 04.11.2020 | BG | 04.02.2021 | IS | 04.03.2021 | IE | 27.03.2021 | LU | 27.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
MK | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
LU | 27.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
IE | 27.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 04.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202008005791U (BEKUPLAST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]JP2009023669 (MEIJI GOMU KASEI KK) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009018827 (SANKO CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2016112866 | by applicant | WO2009050689 | US6293418 | DE202011102591U | EP2112080 |