EP3595682 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR SELECTIVE ELIMINATION AND REPLACEMENT OF HEMATOPOIETIC STEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poseida Therapeutics, Inc. 4242 Campus Point Court Suite 700 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERTAG, Eric 9390 Town Centre Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
SHEDLOCK, Devon 9390 Town Centre Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
DOWN, Julian David 9390 Town Centre Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2020/08] |
Former [2020/04] | 01 /
OSTERTAG, Eric 4242 Campus Point Court Suite 700 San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
02 /
SHEDLOCK, Devon 4242 Campus Point Court Suite 700 San Diego, California 92121 / US | |||
03 /
DOWN, Julian David 4242 Campus Pont Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18715336.6 | 13.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US22169 | Priority number, date | US201762470814P | 13.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762470814 P | US201762596062P | 07.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762596062 P | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169948 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3595682 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, A61K35/28, A61K48/00, C12N5/0783, C12N15/09 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7076 (IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/001111 (CN);
A61K31/664 (IL,US);
A61K31/675 (IL,KR);
A61K35/17 (IL);
A61K35/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/177 (IL,US);
A61K38/1774 (IL,US);
A61K38/193 (IL,US);
A61K38/4873 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/52 (IL,US);
A61K39/39 (IL,US);
A61K39/3955 (IL,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464402 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464411 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K45/06 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61K9/0085 (IL,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/02 (CN);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P37/02 (EP,IL);
C07K14/7051 (CN);
C07K16/2803 (CN);
C12N15/11 (IL,US);
C12N9/1241 (IL,US);
C12N9/22 (IL,US);
C12Y207/07 (IL,US);
C12Y304/22055 (EP,IL,KR);
C12Y304/22062 (IL,US);
C12Y502/01008 (IL,US);
A61K2039/5156 (CN);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR);
C07K2317/622 (CN);
C07K2319/02 (CN);
C07K2319/03 (CN);
C07K2319/33 (CN);
C07K2319/74 (CN);
C12N2310/20 (IL,US);
C12N2510/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2800/80 (IL,US);
C12N2800/90 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/28, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM SELEKTIVEN ELIMINIEREN UND ERSETZEN VON HÄMATOPOIETISCHEN STAMMZELLEN | [2020/04] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR SELECTIVE ELIMINATION AND REPLACEMENT OF HEMATOPOIETIC STEM CELLS | [2020/04] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉLIMINATION ET DE REMPLACEMENT SÉLECTIFS DE CELLULES SOUCHES HÉMATOPOÏÉTIQUES | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 11.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5733746 | US4656134 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4704692 | US4766067 | US4795699 | US4800159 | US4889818 | US4921794 | US4939666 | US4946778 | US4965188 | US4994370 | WO9117271 | US5066584 | WO9118980 | WO9119818 | US5091310 | WO9205258 | US5122464 | US5130238 | US5142033 | WO9214843 | WO9216221 | US5168062 | WO9308278 | US5223409 | US5260203 | US5266491 | US5385839 | US5403484 | US5427908 | US5455030 | US5518889 | WO9619256 | US5534621 | US5571698 | US5576195 | US5580717 | US5580734 | US5595898 | US5618920 | US5641670 | US5643768 | US5656730 | US5658754 | US5693493 | US5698435 | US5698417 | US5733761 | US5750373 | US5763733 | US5767260 | US5770359 | US5827739 | US5837500 | US5856456 | US5885793 | WO2016US37922 |